Federal Trade Commission v. Ramsey et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth A Marra |
Case #: | 9:17-cv-80032 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2017 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Data Guru LLC
|
|
Defendant
Christopher Herghelegiu
|
|
Defendant
Leading Appex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Brian Offner
|
|
Defendant
Prime Marketing LLC
|
|
Defendant
Justin Ramsey
|
|
Defendant
Tailbone Security LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Federal Trade Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Permanent Injunction
Fri 04/14 1:43 PM
STIPULATED FINAL ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS JUSTIN RAMSEY AND PRIME MARKETING. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 4/14/2017. (ir) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/11 5:05 PM
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Filing Proposed Stipulated Final Order as to Defendants Ramsey and Prime Marketing (Barlow, Ian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Stipulated Final Order as to Defendants Ramsey and Prime Marketing | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/22 8:50 AM
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Case Status (Deitch, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/17 10:04 AM
NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission of Case Status (Deitch, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed
Tue 02/07 2:56 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Federal Trade Commission. Prime Marketing LLC served on 1/27/2017, answer due 2/17/2017; Justin Ramsey served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/3/2017.(Deitch, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Certification | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Permanent Injunction
Wed 02/01 4:26 PM
STIPULATED FINAL ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS BRIAN OFFNER, DATA GURU, LLC, TAILBONE SECURITY LLC AND LEADING APEX LLC. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/1/2017. (ir) |
|
7 | 7
order
Permanent Injunction
Wed 02/01 4:24 PM
STIPULATED FINAL ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND CIVIL PENALTY JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT CHRISTOPHER HERGHELEGIU, DATA GURU LLC, AND TAILBONE SECURITY LLC. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/1/2017. (ir) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Settlement Agreement
Fri 01/13 11:17 AM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT with (1) Brian Offner, Data Guru LLC, Tailbone Security LLC, and Leading Appex LLC and (2) Christopher Herghelegiu, Data Guru LLC and Tailbone Security LLC by Federal Trade Commission(Deitch, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certification | ||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Thu 01/12 11:14 AM
Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 1/11/2017. (ir) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/11 9:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Data Guru LLC, Christopher Herghelegiu, Leading Appex LLC, Brian Offner, Prime Marketing LLC, Justin Ramsey, Tailbone Security LLC. (jas) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Wed 01/11 8:58 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (jas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Wed 01/11 8:57 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra (jas) |
|
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Federal Trade Commission.(Deitch, Russell) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 3 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 4 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 5 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 7 Summon(s), | ||
Att: 8 Summon(s) |