Katherine B. Robinson v. DOJ/DEA
Original Case: 8:16-cv-03850
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv.us-01036 |
Type | civil u.s. / united states |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 26, 2017 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, (DOJ/DEA)
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
VIRGINIA EMPLOYMENT COMMISSION
|
|
Plaintiff
DANA B. WILLIAMS
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KATHERINE B. ROBINSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2017 4:33 AM EDT |
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-03850-DKC. Case manager: EMusser. 17-1036 (EM) | |
2 | 2 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Katherine B. Robinson. Informal Opening Brief due 02/03/2017 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. 17-1036 (EM) | |
3 | 3 RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 01/24/2017 17-1036 (EM) |