Homer City Generation, L.P.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10086 |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Plan Confirmed: | Feb 15, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Homer City Generation, L.P.
1750 Power Plant Road
Homer City, PA 15748 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:17 PM EST |
Attorney
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
|
|
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Creditor
NAES Corporation
1180 NW Maple Street Suite 200
Issaquah, WA 98027 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Morgan Stanley Senior Funding, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GPSF Securities, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
EFS HC GP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
EFS Homer City, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
EFS-N LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Environmental Resources Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GE Capital US Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Environmental Protection, Office of Chief Counsel
400 Waterfront Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cleveland Brothers Equipment Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ad hoc group of holders of the outstanding 8.137% Senior Secured Notes due 2019 and 8.734% Senior Secured Notes due 2026
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
New York Independent System Operator, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PJT Partners LP
|
|
Interested Party
VFS Leasing Co.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | US coal plant owner Homer City Generation files for bankruptcy (cnbc.com) |
Submitted Thu 01/12/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |