Pierce v. Pfizer, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Richard Seeborg |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00131 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Pierce
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 14, 2020 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case Closed
Thu 05/14 5:44 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: Pursuant to the Court's order of 4/8/2020 in the MDL 3:16-md-2691-RS master file (dkt. ##1021), civil case no. 3:17-cv-131-RS is terminated. cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/08 3:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE The filing of the judgment dated April 8, 2020 in any case that was previously dismissed is a function of the courts automated systems and is not intended to have any effect on such prior dismissal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/08 2:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OFDEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/13 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darrell Pierce. Pfizer, Inc. served on 2/2/2017, answer due 2/23/2017.(Cory, Ernest) (Filed on 2/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 01/23 3:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Pfizer, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 01/11 1:46 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/11 12:50 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cory, Ernest) (Filed on 1/11/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Pfizer, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11066661.). Filed byDarrell Pierce.(Cory, Ernest) (Filed on 1/11/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |