|
GPO
Dec 18 2017
ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler deferring ruling on (37), (89) Motion to Certify Class; deferring ruling on (87) Motion to Compel; deferring ruling on (88) Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on (91) Motion to Compel in case 3:16-cv-03371-LB; deferring ruling on (25) Motion to Certify Class; deferring ruling on (26) Motion to Dismiss; deferring ruling on (28) Motion to Compel in case 3:17-cv-00138-LB; and staying proceedings.As set forth in the attached order, the court defers decision on the parties' pending motions. The court additionally stays these cases pending the Supreme Court's decision in Morris v. Ernst & Young, LLP, No. 16-300 (U.S.) and the court's decision, to follow thereafter, on the defendants' motions to compel arbitration. The court equitably tolls the FLSA statute of limitations for potential opt-in plaintiffs while these actions are stayed. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
|
|
GPO
Aug 29 2018
ORDER GRANTING (87 in 3:16-cv-03371-LB) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss/Stay Action filed by Gold Club-SF, LLC, S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD; (91 in 3:16-cv-03371-LB) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss/Stay Action (Dora Marchand) filed by Gold Club-SF, LLC, S.A.W. Entertainment, LTD; (28 in 3:17-cv-00138-LB) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss/Stay Action filed by Saw Entertainment Ltd.As set forth in the attached order, the court grants the defendants' motions to compel as follows: Named plaintiffs Nicole Hughes, Angelynn Hermes, Penny Nunez, Elana Pera, and Sarah Murphy, and opt-in plaintiff Dora Marchand, must submit all claims other than California Private Attorney General Act (PAGA) claims to binding arbitration. The court stays each plaintiff's PAGA claims (if any) while that plaintiff's arbitration is pending. The plaintiffs may file a motion to amend the Hughes complaint to add a new named plaintiff or plaintiffs by September 19, 2018. The defendants may oppose any such motion. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on August 29, 2018. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
|
|
GPO
May 09 2019
r they should be stayed pending the arbitration of her Pre-January-2017 Claims, and (2) whether the court should authorize issuance of an FLSA notice.(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler terminating (138) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (139) Motion to Compel Arbitration; granting in part and denying in part (152) Motion to Enforce Arbitration Order ; granting (153) Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying (161) Motion for Reconsideration in case 3:16-cv-03371-LB; granting (62) Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part (70) Motion to Enforce Arbitration Order in case 3:17-cv-00138-LB. As set forth in the attached, the court orders the following.The court grants the defendants' motion to enforce its August 2018 arbitration order (but denies the motion to hold the plaintiffs in contempt or impose sanctions). The court denies the plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of the August 2018 arbitration order. The court grants all pending motions to compel arbitration except that it denies the motion to compel with respect to the claims Ms. Tejada brings in this action arising after January 31, 2017 (the "Post-January-2017 Claims"). The court orders the plaintiffs to submit all claims other than California Private Attorney General Act ("PAGA") claims and Ms. Tejada's Post-January-2017 Claims to binding arbitration.The court stays each plaintiff's PAGA claim (if any) while that respective plaintiff's arbitration is pending.The court administratively terminates the defendants' motion to dismiss without prejudice with respect to each plaintiff while that respective plaintiff's arbitration is pending.As the parties and the court discussed at the hearing, the parties will brief (1) the next steps for Ms. Tejada's Post-January-2017 Claims, including whethe
|
|
GPO
Nov 29 2022
ORDER.In the attached order, the court approves the class-action settlement. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/29/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|