Trujillo v. Garcia et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00137 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 1:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fernando Gonzalez
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Armando Perez Garcia
Terminated: 03/06/2017
|
|
Defendant
Jose De Jesus Perez Garcia
Terminated: 03/06/2017
|
|
Defendant
Francisco Ramos
Terminated: 03/06/2017
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
59 | 59
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 10/12 7:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING 58 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/12/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) |
|
58 | 58
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 10/12 9:37 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of action filed by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |