Silverman v. Humboldt County Correctional Facility
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Referred: | Pslc Rmh |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00089 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago |
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment Terminate Civil Case
Fri 10/20 10:02 AM
JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Magistrate Kandis A. Westmore on 10/20/17.(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/20 10:01 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/20/17.(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Wed 08/09 9:17 AM
Letter from Jacob Silverman regarding withdrawal of filings. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/26 3:49 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO: (1) CONSENT TO CONVERTING HIS PETITION TO A CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT; OR (2) WITHDRAW HIS PETITION by Judge Kandis A. Westmore, finding as moot 6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/02 2:09 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacob Silverman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Thu 03/02 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacob Silverman.(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Wed 01/11 11:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/16/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
4 | 4
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/11 11:19 AM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Wed 01/11 11:18 AM
Letter from Jacob Silverman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement
Wed 01/11 11:17 AM
Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Jacob Silverman. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/11 11:16 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byJacob Silverman.(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |