Wells v. Sam's East, Inc.
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan J Dlott |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00026 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 4:21 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sam's East, Inc.
702 SW Eight Street
Bentonville, AR 72716 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leighann Wells
P.O. Box 1315
Inez, KY 41224 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/27 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Leighann Wells (Anderson, Brigham) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 03/30 12:31 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2017 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (vp) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 4:27 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Leighann Wells (Anderson, Brigham) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/16 4:25 PM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Leighann Wells (Anderson, Brigham) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/31 1:58 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Sam's East, Inc. of Service of Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery (Jewell, Jackie) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/12 10:25 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand originally filed 12/21/2016 in Lawrence County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 16 PI 872) by Sam's East, Inc. (eh) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 10:24 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 11/30/2016 in Lawrence County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 16 PI 872) by Leighann Wells against Sam's East, Inc. (eh) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 01/12 10:27 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (eh) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 01/11 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lawrence County Court of Common Pleas, case number 16 PI 872 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5795269), filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Kasson, D) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet |