Leonard v. Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy S Black |
Referred: | Michael R Merz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 535 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 5:10 AM EDT |
Petitioner
Patrick Leonard
413-438 CHILLICOTHE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P.O. Box 5500 15802 STATE ROUTE 104 NORTH
CHILLICOTHE, OH 45601 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 04/04 4:27 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT affirming16 DECISION AND ENTRY. (gs) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/04 4:23 PM
DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Accordingly, as Petitioner is deceased and no longer in custody as is necessary for this Court to exercise habeas corpus jurisdiciton, this matter is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 4/4/17. (gs) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/07 11:34 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 in 1:17-cv-00028-TSB-MRM, Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, re6 in 1:09-cv-00056-SJD-MRM Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 3/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 3/7/17. (kma) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Suggestion of Death
Tue 03/07 8:22 AM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Petitioner Patrick Leonard. (Wright, Carol) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Related Case Memorandum
Fri 03/03 1:52 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:09-cv-56 are related, the subject case nevertheless will remain with the Judge to who it was assigned. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/3/2017. (jlw) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/27 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L Wille for Respondent Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution (Wille, Charles) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/27 11:26 AM
NOTICE by Petitioner Patrick Leonard of Filing (Wright, Carol) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 02/27 4:31 PM
USCA Order re3 Transfer Order granting movant's motion to dismiss this proceeding as prematurely docketed and dismissing the appeal. Note: No Mandate to issue. (sct) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 4:49 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Warden, Chillicothe Correctional Institution of Sixth Circuit Filing (Wille, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Wille NOA, | ||
Att: 2 Lowe NOA, | ||
Att: 3 Sixth Circuit Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 11:39 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Patrick Leonard of Filing of Motion to Dismiss as Prematurely Docketed (Wright, Carol) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 11:34 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Patrick Leonard of Filing of Notice of Appearance (Wright, Carol) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/24 11:26 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Patrick Leonard of Filing of Notice of Appearance (Wright, Carol) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Substitute Attorney Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/17 11:42 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Carol Wright , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sharon Hicks ( Responses due by 3/10/2017) by Plaintiff Patrick Leonard. (Wright, Carol) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/17 3:18 PM
Notation ORDER granting4 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sharon A Hicks terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 2/17/2017. (kpf) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 01/18 12:35 PM
USCA Case Number 17-3039 re3 Transfer Order. Case Manager - Patricia Elder. (sct) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 01/12 3:19 PM
TRANSFER ORDER - The Petition herein is found to be second-or-successive within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b) Therefore, the Clerk is ORDERED to transfer this case to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals for a determination of whether Mr. Leonard may proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz on 1/12/17. (kma) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/12 11:03 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Patrick Leonard re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Civil Cover Sheet (Hicks, Sharon) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/11 4:48 PM
First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0648-5796027.), filed by Patrick Leonard. (Hicks, Sharon) |