Hill v. Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 535 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 4:20 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
Genesis Hill
250-830 CHILLICOTHE CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION P.O. Box 5500 15802 STATE ROUTE 104 NORTH
CHILLICOTHE, OH 45601 |
Represented By
|
Respondent
Warden Chillicothe Correctional Institution
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 01/10 8:58 AM
USCA ORDER - Upon consideration of the movant's motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal herein pursuant to Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the appeal is dismissed (pb) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
9
pgs
order
Order
Thu 12/14 9:37 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING the instant Petition to the Sixth Circuit for a determination of whether the Petition may proceed. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to TRANSFER the Petition (ECF No. 1) to the Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit for authorization to be filed. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/14/2017. (cw) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Related Case Memorandum
Wed 03/22 10:39 PM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 1:98-cv-452 are NOT related. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/20/2017. (er) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/11 4:53 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0648-5796035.), filed by Genesis Hill. (Thompson, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |