Davis v. US Bank, NA et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | George C Smith |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00032 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 4:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LSF8 Master Participation Trust
Defendant
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Bank, NA
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Terrance M Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Davis
Plaintiff
Columbus, OH 43229 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 11/03 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA (Folland, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/01 4:38 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 11/9/2017 if case should not be set for December 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/1/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Saturday, August 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Sat 08/05 5:55 PM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Settlement Week due 12/2017. (agm) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order
Wed 07/26 5:01 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 8/4/2017 if case should not be set for September 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/26/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order Reassigning Case
Sat 07/01 10:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/30/17. (jcw) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 05/31 1:02 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Reschedule Settlement Conference for the September 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/31/17. (sem) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/31 1:06 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Case now part of September 2017 Settlement Week. (sem) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/26 12:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/1/2017. September Settlement Week by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, May 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
med
Notice Setting Mediation
Sat 05/13 12:36 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Terrance Miller to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 6/13/2017 at 01:30 PM. (sh) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Thu 05/04 5:11 PM
ORDER - This case is referred to the June 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/4/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Wed 05/03 5:07 PM
ORDER granting24 MOTION TO ATTEND SETTLEMENT WEEK CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/3/2017. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 05/02 9:30 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct21 Order, MOTION TO ATTEND SETTLEMENT WEEK CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Mon 05/01 3:34 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice22 Motion for Leave to Participate by Telephone in the Settlement Week Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/1/17. (sem) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Appear
Thu 04/27 2:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear SETTLEMENT WEEK CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 04/21 2:49 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 5/1/2017 if case should not be set for June 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/21/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Brief
Tue 04/18 4:34 PM
BRIEF re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/11 9:29 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Davis. (Flick, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:18 PM
DEFENDANT U.S. BANK'S ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/22 3:15 PM
DEFENDANT CALIBER HOME LOANS ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 03/21 4:21 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant LSF8 Master Participation Trust. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Tue 03/07 5:52 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the JUNE 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Motions regarding personal jurisdiction due by 3/31/2017. Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 4/30/2017. Discovery due by 9/30/2017. Dispositive motions due by 10/31/2017. The parties shall contact the Court if they think that a mediation earlier than 6/2017 might be productive. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/7/2017. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 02/28 4:39 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Lawrence Davis. (Flick, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 02/21 3:31 PM
ORDER granting12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. answer due 3/27/2017; LSF8 Master Participation Trust answer due 3/27/2017; US Bank, NA answer due 3/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/21/2017. (agm) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 02/17 1:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/27/2017. To Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/31 11:41 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/24/2017. (Flick, Brian) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/31 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant LSF8 Master Participation Trust. LSF8 Master Participation Trust served on 1/16/2017, answer due 2/24/2017. (Flick, Brian) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/31 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant US Bank, NA. US Bank, NA served on 1/17/2017, answer due 2/24/2017. (Flick, Brian) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 01/26 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference of the parties set for 3/7/2017 @ 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 01/26 9:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Caliber Home Loans, Inc. answer due 2/24/2017; LSF8 Master Participation Trust answer due 2/24/2017; US Bank, NA answer due 2/24/2017. (mas) |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/25 3:42 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Extension to Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA. (Folland, Robert) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/19 1:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants US Bank, NA, US Bancorp identifying Corporate Parent US Bancorp for US Bank, NA.. (Dirisamer, David) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/19 1:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Dirisamer, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/19 1:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Dirisamer, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/19 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Dirisamer for Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Dirisamer, David) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/12 8:20 AM
Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust & US Bank, NA. (er) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 6:53 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF8 Master Participation Trust, US Bank, NA as Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5796127), filed by Lawrence Davis. (Dann, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion for Substitution, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent in Rem Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw Sale, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Notice of Sale, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Order Withdrawing Sale, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 01-12-16 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 09-14-16 NOE, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit NOE Tracking, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 10-07-16 Extension, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 11-18-16 Response, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Form |