ARROWHEAD MEDICAL RESOURCES, LLC
Minnesota Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Kressel |
Case #: | 5:17-bk-50019 |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2019 |
Debtor
ARROWHEAD MEDICAL RESOURCES, LLC
35010 ROLLAND RD
COHASSET, MN 55721 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Nauni Jo Manty
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Avenue North Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415 |
Docket last updated: 01/12/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/11 4:24 PM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 7 petition 17-50019 [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 9808459. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
MNB Add creditor to matrix
Wed 01/11 3:45 PM
List of Creditors load 40 creditors added (ADIclerk) |
||
1 | 1
misc
MNB Voluntary chapter 7 petition (fee)
Wed 01/11 3:15 PM
Chapter 7 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: ARROWHEAD MEDICAl RESOURCES, LLC. Fee Amount $335.00 (Greenlee, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Signature declaration | ||
2 | 2
misc
MNB Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys
Wed 01/11 3:21 PM
Notice of responsibilities of chapter 7 debtors and their attorneys filed by ARROWHEAD MEDICAl RESOURCES, LLC and Peter Greenlee. (Greenlee, Peter) |
|
3 | 3
misc
MNB Corporate ownership statement Reference: Fed. R. Bankr.Proc. 7007.1
Wed 01/11 3:22 PM
Corporate ownership statement filed by ARROWHEAD MEDICAl RESOURCES, LLC. (Greenlee, Peter) |
|
4 | 4
court
MNB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset
Wed 01/11 4:27 PM
Meeting of Creditors. Trustee Nauni Jo Manty assigned to the case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/2/2017 at 08:30 AM at Mtg Duluth, 515 W 1st St 4th Fl, Courtroom 2. (Debi MNBD) |