Greenwood v. Berryhill
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Referred: | Renee Harris Toliver |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00122 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Defendant
Carolyn W Colvin
|
|
Defendant
Nancy A Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Interested Party
|
|
Plaintiff
Crystal R Greenwood
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment
Wed 03/28 12:27 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Nancy A Berryhill against Crystal R Greenwood. The Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/28/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Findings and Recommendations on Case
Wed 03/28 12:25 PM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re19 Findings and Recommendations on Case. The Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/28/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Thu 03/22 10:08 PM
OBJECTION to19 Findings and Recommendations by Crystal R Greenwood (Honig, Ronald) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 03/08 11:03 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's Motion15 for Summary Judgment should be DENIED, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, as construed from her response brief16 should be GRANTED, and the Commissioner's decision should be AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/8/2018) (mcrd) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/03 3:03 PM
STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: Under the authority of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and Rule 2(c) of Miscellaneous Order No. 6 of this district, this action is hereby REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for full case management. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2017) (sss) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Appellants Reply Brief
Tue 05/23 12:22 PM
Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Crystal R Greenwood. (Honig, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 05/09 4:39 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Nancy A Berryhill re:15 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Olszewski, Natalie) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 04/19 8:21 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crystal R Greenwood with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Honig, Ronald) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Mon 03/27 8:29 AM
ORDER: Within 30 days of the date the Commissioner filed an answer, plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment. Within the time required by LR 7.1(e), the Commissioner shall file a combined response to plaintiff's motion and cross motion for summary judgment. Within the time required by LR 7.1(f), plaintiff may file a combined reply brief in support of plaintiff's motion and response to the Commissioners cross-motion. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 3/27/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Administrative Record
Mon 03/20 11:04 AM
Administrative Record consisting of Social Security record filed by Nancy A Berryhill. (Olszewski, Natalie) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 3 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 4 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 5 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 6 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 7 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 8 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 9 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 10 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 11 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 12 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 13 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 14 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 15 Additional Page(s), | ||
Att: 16 Additional Page(s) | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 10:54 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy A Berryhill. (Olszewski, Natalie) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/20 10:53 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nancy A Berryhill. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Natalie E Olszewski added to party Nancy A Berryhill(pty:dft) (Olszewski, Natalie) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned
Tue 01/31 2:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carolyn W Colvin (US Attorney) ; served on 1/20/2017. (ndt) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned
Tue 01/31 2:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carolyn W Colvin ; served on 1/23/2017. (ndt) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned
Tue 01/31 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Carolyn W Colvin (Attorney General) ; served on 1/25/2017. (ndt) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Business Reply Card Signed
Tue 01/17 3:47 PM
Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint. Signed on 1/13/2017. (epm) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/13 4:05 PM
Summons issued as to Carolyn W Colvin, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ykp) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/13 2:19 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons and deliver the summons and a copy of the complaint in the case to the U.S. Marshal. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/13/2017) (chmb) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
Fitzwater
Thu 01/12 8:48 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (epm) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 01/11 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Crystal R Greenwood (Honig, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 01/11 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crystal R Greenwood. (Honig, Ronald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Carolyn W Colvin filed by Crystal R Greenwood. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Honig, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |