Carol Stomberg v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00254 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Synthes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Stomberg
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Fri 03/10 1:48 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Northern District of Texas, 3:17-cv-00698 filed 3/10/2017. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Wed 03/08 10:43 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 262 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 3/8/2017. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 02/28 9:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 03/06/2017 to 04/17/17 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 02/14 1:01 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS9 by Judge George H. Wu. The Parties' request for a stay of proceedings is GRANTED. A status conference is set for March 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. (See attached document for details.) (lom) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Mon 01/30 11:23 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
11 | 11
testxtonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 01/30 10:47 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for March 6, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Fri 01/27 2:33 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-00254 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Stay Case
Wed 01/18 1:30 PM
STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc..(Olah, Kelley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 01/17 9:55 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (cr) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 01/12 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on January 11, 2017.(Olah, Kelley) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment to Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 01/12 2:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 01/12 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 01/11 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(Olah, Kelley) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1 of 7 to Notice of related cases, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2 of 7 to Notice of related cases, | ||
Att: 3 Part 3 of 7 to Notice of related cases, | ||
Att: 4 Part 4 of 7 to Notice of related cases, | ||
Att: 5 Part 5 of 7 to Notice of related cases, | ||
Att: 6 Part 6 of 7 to Notice of related cases, | ||
Att: 7 Part 7 of 7 to Notice of related cases | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 01/11 4:54 PM
Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., (Olah, Kelley) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 01/11 4:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(Olah, Kelley) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 01/11 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC642934 Receipt No: 0973-19180964 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy International Limited, Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy International Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson International(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (part 1 of 3), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 3), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 (part 3 of 3) | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 01/12 1:54 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Johnson and Johnson, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson International, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc., Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. A Professional Corporation. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Carol Stomberg. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/6/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2 (PART 1 OF 3) (ghap) |