Akbar v. Barretto
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maria-Elena James |
Referred: | Pslc Msh |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00119 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2017 |
Petitioner
Mahdee Adul Akbar
|
|
Respondent
Jennifer Barretto
|
GPO
Jan 19 2017
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/19/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_sup
Brief
Mon 08/07 3:29 PM
Petition for Consideration filed byMahdee Adul Akbar. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (8/7/2017) Envelope | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Reconsideration PSP
Wed 07/19 4:36 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re4 Order filed by Mahdee Adul Akbar.(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 02/08 3:11 PM
Mailed original documents filed in this court in error -- Dkt. Nos. 5, 6, 7 -- to receiving court, noting CAED case number.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/06 12:41 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Mahdee Adul Akbar.(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Mon 02/06 12:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Mahdee Adul Akbar.(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 02/06 12:37 PM
Letter dated 01/23/17; from Mahdee Abdul Akbar re Letter Addressed to Judge Henderson.(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
misc
Receipt
Mon 01/23 3:48 PM
Receipt of transferred case from USDC-Eastern California. The case no. is 17-140. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017) |
||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 01/19 11:50 AM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/19/2017.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 01/11 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial by Mahdee Adul Akbar (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
2 | 2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Wed 01/11 4:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/21/2017. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) Modified on 1/11/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 01/11 4:38 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.00-DUE). Filed byMahdee Adul Akbar.(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |