Mullins et al v. HP Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00141 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 1:54 AM PDT |
Defendant
HP Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalene Mullins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 02/16 7:35 PM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. The Clerk shall close the file. ***Motions terminated 20 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR is MOOT. All deadlines/hearings are terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/16/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 02/16 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 2/16/2017) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/07 10:14 AM
(Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 02/06 11:36 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Hon. Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Mon 02/06 11:01 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/6/17. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/03 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Michael Strumwasser (Strumwasser, Jared) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 02/03 12:13 PM
NOTICE by HP Inc. -- Corporate Disclosure Statement (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 02/03 12:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by HP Inc. (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/03 12:03 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint,,, Stipulation To Extend Time To Respond To Initial Complaint filed by HP Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Fri 02/03 12:01 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by HP Inc. filed by HP Inc.. (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
19 | 19
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Fri 02/03 12:00 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/03 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel G. Liversidge (Liversidge, Samuel) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/31 9:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart. All Defendants. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/31/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation
Wed 01/25 7:17 PM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting (32) Stipulation regarding impact of motion to dismiss decision in the San Miguel action on the Ware action.Associated Cases: 5:16-cv-06519-LHK, 5:16-cv-05820-LHK, 5:17-cv-00141-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 01/25 8:31 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event Summons Returned Executed. Re:15 Certificate of Service filed by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 01/24 4:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart re1 Complaint,,, Proof of Service (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Tue 01/24 9:20 AM
**CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case re-assignment to Judge Lucy Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 2/15/2017 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 01/24 8:22 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Hon. Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case.(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/18 9:22 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/18/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 01/17 7:47 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 01/17 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart Proof of Service (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/17 4:21 PM
NOTICE by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING [N.D. CAL. CIV. L.R. 3-13] (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/17 1:54 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart.. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/24 8:55 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/12 12:13 PM
Summons Issued as to HP Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/12 9:30 AM
Amended Proposed Summons. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/12/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/12 8:26 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 01/11 5:23 PM
Proposed Summons. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 01/11 5:22 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Rosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart . (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 5:21 PM
COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint [F.R.C.P 23] For Damages and Demand For Jury Trial against HP Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11068196.). Filed byRosalene Mullins, Sharon Stewart. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2017) |