Seibel v. PHWLV, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00091 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 1:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
PHWLV, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gordon Ramsay
|
Represented By
|
Nominal Defendant
GR Burgr LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Rowen Seibel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Terminate Case ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/22 11:44 AM
ORDER granting30 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice. Case terminated. All motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 02/21 1:10 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 02/15 11:50 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2017 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo ; Pla Counsel: Daniel McNutt, Matthew Wolf, Paul Sweeny ; Def Counsel: James Pisanelli, Debra Spinelli, Brittnie Watkins, Allen Wilt, Michael Thomas (client representative) ; Court Reporter/Recorder: Felicia Zabin ; Time of Hearing: 2:55 p.m. - 3:08 p.m. ; Courtroom: 6D ; The court makes preliminary remarks regarding defendant PHWLV, LLC's motion for leave to file supplement to opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 28 . The court advises counsel that before this court can address the motion for preliminary injunction 3 , additional briefing is needed on the subject-matter jurisdictional issues. The motion for leave to file supplement 28 is deemed GRANTED. Plaintiff must file its response brief by 2/21/2017. Defendant's response due within 7 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/10 6:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant PHWLV, LLC. (Pisanelli, James) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 02/09 2:09 PM
REPLY to Response to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel.(McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 02/08 4:14 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion re24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 02/08 8:34 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 02/06 11:06 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Related Cases
Fri 02/03 11:21 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:17-cv-00346 by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Corrected Image/Document
Wed 02/01 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re17 Response to Motion, 21 Notice: Attorney Action Required, by Defendant Gordon Ramsay. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Wilt, Allen) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice: Attorney Action Required
Wed 02/01 12:48 PM
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to17 Response to Motion, ERROR: Page 430 of exhibit 7 page 348 appears to be blank. Attorney Allen Wilt advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to 17 Response to Motion,. (no image attached) (DKJ) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 01/31 10:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PHWLV, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Corporate Parent Caesars Growth Partners, LLC, Corporate Parent Caesars Acquisition Company for PHWLV, LLC added. . (Spinelli, Debra) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 01/31 10:24 PM
RESPONSE to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant PHWLV, LLC. PLANET HOLLYWOOD'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Replies due by 2/7/2017.(Spinelli, Debra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 01/31 7:50 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Gordon Ramsay that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Other Affiliate GRUS Licensing, LP, Other Affiliate Kavalake Ltd., Other Affiliate GRUS General Partner LLC, Other Affiliate Cayetana Ramsay for Gordon Ramsay added. . (Wilt, Allen) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 01/31 7:42 PM
RESPONSE to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant Gordon Ramsay. Replies due by 2/7/2017.(Wilt, Allen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of David Kerr, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Gaut Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin Gaut Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Delaware Corporate Doc, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Dudderar Part 1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Dudderar Part 2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Declaration of Timothy Dudderar Part 3 | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 01/24 12:38 PM
ORDER Granting13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond/Reply re3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Answer/Respond re1 Complaint. Responses due by 1/31/2017. Replies due by 2/9/2017. PHWLV, LLC answer due 2/28/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/24 12:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rowen Seibel re1 Complaint,,. GR Burgr LLC served on 1/24/2017, answer due 2/14/2017. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
service
Acceptance of Service
Tue 01/24 8:47 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Gordon Ramsay on 1/23/2017; executed by Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Mon 01/23 5:03 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,1 Complaint,, ; STIPULATION TO EXTEND AND/OR SET DEADLINES FOR BRIEFS RELATED TO THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ALSO TO RESPOND TO THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT (First Request) by Defendant PHWLV, LLC. (Spinelli, Debra) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/20 2:51 PM
Summons Issued as to GR Burgr LLC. (MMM) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Thu 01/19 4:42 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration
Tue 01/17 3:14 PM
DECLARATION of Service re3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,4 Appendix, ; and Notice of Hearing by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 01/17 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rowen Seibel re1 Complaint,,. PHWLV, LLC served on 1/11/2017, answer due 2/1/2017. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 01/11 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2017 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC) |
|
7 | 7
minord
Reassign Judge Minute Order
Wed 01/11 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 1/11/2017. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:17-cv-00091-JAD-PAL . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/11 2:26 PM
Summons Issued as to PHWLV, LLC, Gordon Ramsay. (MMM) |
|
5 | 5
minord
Recusal Minute Order
Wed 01/11 2:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 1/11/2017. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Appendix
Wed 01/11 10:22 AM
APPENDIX to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel.(McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 01/11 10:17 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Rowen Seibel. Responses due by 1/25/2017. (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 01/11 10:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Rowen Seibel that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate GR US Licensing LP, Other Affiliate Kavalake Limited for Rowen Seibel added. . (McNutt, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT against PHWLV, LLC, Gordon Ramsay (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4432352), filed by Rowen Seibel. Proof of service due by 4/11/2017.(McNutt, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons PHWLV, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Gordon Ramsay | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 01/11 2:09 PM
Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (MMM) |