Mintun v. PHH Mortgage Corp. et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00092 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 1:38 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PHH Mortgage Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn V. Mintun
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Washington Federal
Terminated: 04/03/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Terminated: 07/07/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/05 4:50 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.47 Stipulation of Dismissal of Trans Union, LLC, Pursuant to FRCP 41(A)(I)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/01 10:02 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Trans Union LLC, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
minord
Minute Order Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/27 11:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 7/27/2017. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Good cause appearing, the Joint motion to Dismiss (ECF No.45 ) is granted. Defendant PHH Mortgage Corp. d/b/a Mortgage Service Center is terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/26 6:26 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss PHH Mortgage Corp. d/b/a Mortgage Service Center by Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun. Responses due by 8/9/2017. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
44 | 44
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 07/26 9:14 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.43 Stipulation of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions Inc Pursuant To FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Experian Information Solutions Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/25 12:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Pursuant To FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
minord
Minute Order
Fri 07/07 1:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 7/7/2017. By Judicial Assistant: Kathy Ryd. The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement Between Plaintiff and PHH Mortgage Corporation. (ECF No.40 .) The parties are directed to file dismissal documents by July 26, 2017. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER) |
|
41 | 41
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 07/07 1:47 PM
ORDER pursuant to ECF No.38 Notice re 4m Dismissal, the claims against Equifax Information Services, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/26 1:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corp.. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
minord
Minute Order
Wed 06/07 1:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 6/7/2017. By Judicial Assistant: Kathy Ryd. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ("Experian"). (ECF No.37 .) The parties are directed to file dismissal documents within sixty (60) days. All deadlines regarding Experian are suspended. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Notice re 4m Dismissal
Tue 06/06 12:01 PM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Amended Complaint * in this action was filed on * 1/31/2017. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * Equifax Information Services, LLC. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 06/05 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Settlement with Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
minord
Minute Order
Wed 05/24 10:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 5/24/2017. By Judicial Assistant: Kathy Ryd. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun and Defendant Trans Union, LLC ("Trans Union"). (ECF No.35 .) The parties are directed to file dismissal documents within sixty (60) days. All deadlines regarding Trans Union are suspended. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 05/23 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement with Trans Union LLC by Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
minord
Minute Order
Wed 04/26 10:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 4/26/2017. By Judicial Assistant: Kathy Ryd. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun and Defendant PHH Mortgage Corp. d/b/a Mortgage Service Center ("PHH"). (ECF No.33 .) The parties are directed to file dismissal documents within sixty (60) days. All deadlines regarding PHH are suspended. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/25 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement with PHH Mortgage Corp. d/b/a Mortgage Service Center by Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 04/24 2:19 PM
ORDER approving ECF No.28 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
31 | 31
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Mon 04/24 2:16 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KR) |
|
30 | 30
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 2:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No.29 Proposed Order. Discovery due by 8/21/2017. Motions due by 9/20/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Fri 04/21 9:39 PM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun . (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Stipulation
Fri 04/21 9:29 PM
STIPULATION Proposed Stipulated Protective Order by Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 04/19 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Braster, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Tue 04/11 2:54 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.25 Motion to Extend Time : PHH Mortgage Corp. answer to complaint due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter
Fri 04/07 5:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (Third Request) re1 Complaint,, by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corp.. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 04/03 2:22 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.23 Joint Motion to Dismiss Washington Federal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/03/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Fri 03/31 2:54 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Washington Federal by Defendant Washington Federal. Responses due by 4/14/2017. (Hernandez, Ramir) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 03/14 7:44 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.21 Joint Motion and Order to Extend PHH Mortgage Corporation's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request). Response/Answer due 4/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 03/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/09 11:29 AM
Joint MOTION to Extend PHH Mortgage Corporation's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint re1 Complaint,, Second Request by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corp.. Responses due by 3/23/2017. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 02/28 5:13 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint filed by Washington Federal.(Hernandez, Ramir) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Mon 02/27 2:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc added. . (Braster, Jennifer) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 02/27 2:23 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Braster, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 02/22 4:07 PM
ORDER approving ECF No.15 Stipulation to Extend Time for Washington Federal to Respond to ECF No.6 Amended Complaint. Washington Federal response/answer due 2/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 02/21 4:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Washington Federal that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. . (Hernandez, Ramir) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation
Tue 02/21 4:48 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re6 Amended Complaint ; by Defendant Washington Federal. (Hernandez, Ramir) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/21 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramir Mitchell Hernandez on behalf of Defendant Washington Federal. (Hernandez, Ramir) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 02/21 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Trans Union, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners, Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union, LLC added. . |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 02/21 2:05 PM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint filed by Trans Union, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/7/2017 |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Tue 02/07 2:03 PM
ORDER approving ECF No.10 Stipulation to Extend PHH Mortgage Corporation's Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response/answer due 3/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Stipulation
Mon 02/06 10:50 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, ; STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND PHH MORTGAGE CORPORATION'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Defendant PHH Mortgage Corp.. (Ewing, Kyle) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/02 3:47 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHH Mortgage Corp. re ECF No.6 Amended Complaint. (KW) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 4:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washington Federal, Equifax Information Services, Experian Information Solutions, and Trans Union, LLC re ECF No.6 Amended Complaint.(KW) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
7 | 7
service
Proposed Summons to be issued
Tue 01/31 3:44 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Summons WA, | ||
Att: 2 Summons EQ, | ||
Att: 3 Summons EX, | ||
Att: 4 Summons TU | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/31 3:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Dawn V. Mintun. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 5/1/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Association of Counsel
Wed 01/25 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Matthew I Knepper on behalf of Plaintiff Dawn V. Mintun. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Thu 01/12 11:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/12/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/11 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc, PHH Mortgage Corp., Trans Union, LLC, Washington Federal. (MMM) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 01/11 11:23 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Dawn V. Mintun. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4432609), filed by Dawn V. Mintun. Proof of service due by 4/11/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons PHH, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Wash Fed, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Experian, | ||
Att: 5 Summons TransUnion | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 01/11 4:13 PM
Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM) |