Dunlap v. Wells Fargo Financial et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Peggy A Leen |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00097 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Financial
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol A. Dunlap
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
54 | 54
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/13 8:50 AM
ORDER approving ECF No.53 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Experian Information Solutions Inc. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
53 | 53
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Wed 03/07 3:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Experian Information Solutions, Inc., With Prejudice by Plaintiff Carol A. Dunlap. (Knepper, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
52 | 52
2
pgs
order
Order Show Cause
Wed 03/07 3:11 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) |