Couture v. Clark County Credit Union et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00100 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul J. Couture
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Clark County Credit Union
Terminated: 02/02/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/16 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Paul J. Couture. AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 06/19 12:15 PM
Civil Case Terminated per8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MR) |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 03/07 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PAUL J. COUTURE AND EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by Paul J. Couture. (Krieger, David) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 02/22 1:25 PM
ORDER Granting5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request). Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's response to Plaintiff's1 Complaint due 3/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation
Fri 02/17 12:20 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, ; by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Austin, Bradley) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 02/02 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Paul J. Couture. AS TO DEFENDANT CLARK COUNTY CREDIT UNION ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Fri 02/03 4:36 PM
Party Clark County Credit Union terminated pursuant to4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM) |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/11 3:37 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants re1 Complaint. (ADR) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 01/11 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Paul J. Couture. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4433220), filed by Paul J. Couture. Proof of service due by 4/11/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons CCCU, | ||
Att: 3 Summons EQ | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Wed 01/11 3:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) |