Emerson v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carl W Hoffman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00105 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 10, 2017 2:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy L. Emerson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 03/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago |
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/11 10:41 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.15 Stipulation Dismissing Action with Prejudice as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC Only. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/10 1:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal AS TO OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC ONLY by Plaintiff Roy L. Emerson. (Krieger, David) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minord
Minute Order
Mon 05/15 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 5/15/2017. By Judicial Assistant: Kathy Ryd. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement Between Plaintiff Roy L. Emerson and Defendant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ("Ocwen"). (ECF No.13 .) The parties are directed to file dismissal documents within sixty (60) days. All deadlines regarding Ocwen are suspended. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 05/12 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN ROY L. EMERSON AND OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC by Roy L. Emerson. (Krieger, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (non motion ddls)
Wed 04/26 1:34 PM
ORDER on ECF No.5 STIPULATION : Equifax Information Services, LLC's answer/response to Complaint (ECF No.1 ) due by 3/20/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notices re AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Gen Ord 2013-1 Short Trial Rules
Fri 04/14 2:31 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (KR) |
|
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 04/14 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No.9 Proposed Order. Discovery due by 9/11/2017. Motions due by 10/11/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order
Thu 04/13 11:22 AM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Roy L. Emerson . (Krieger, David) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 1:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Other Affiliate Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC added. . (Bundick, Jacob) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/15 2:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/29/2017.(Zastrow, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/02 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Roy L. Emerson. AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC ONLY (Krieger, David) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation
Fri 02/17 11:41 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re1 Complaint,, ; by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Austin, Bradley) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
minord
Minute Order
Fri 01/13 2:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 1/13/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 01/12 6:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC re1 Complaint. (SLD) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 01/11 4:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Roy L. Emerson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Krieger, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/11 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4433564), filed by Roy L. Emerson. Proof of service due by 4/11/2017.(Krieger, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Ocwen, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Eq | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Thu 01/12 6:40 AM
Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (SLD) |