Sig Sauer, Inc. v. Cybergun, S.A.
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Steven J Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00014 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:44 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cybergun, S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sig Sauer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Sig Sauer files patent infringement lawsuit against BB gun maker Cybergun (seacoastonline.com) |
Submitted Mon 02/13/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
utility
AO 120 Patent/Trademark
Wed 11/29 9:53 AM
AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(jbw) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 11/29 9:54 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jbw) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Wed 11/29 8:21 AM
ENDORSED ORDER re: 27 Stipulation of Dismissal. Text of Order: Stipulation approved; so ordered. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/21 12:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal as to case With Prejudice by Cybergun, S.A.(Lucic, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
notice
Case Settlement
Wed 11/15 1:14 PM
Attorney Robert Lucic advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 12/15/2017. (jbw) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 11/15 2:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER mooting 17 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Moot by reason of settlement. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) |
||
order
Order on Discovery Plan
Wed 11/15 2:56 PM
ENDORSED ORDER mooting 22 Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Moot by reason of settlement. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
notice
Pretrial Conference
Wed 10/18 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2017 11:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/3/2017. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jbw) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Surreply to Reply
Tue 10/10 2:29 PM
SURREPLY to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Geiger, Alexandra) Modified on 10/10/2017 to add link to17 Motion to Dismiss. (jbw) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 10/10 10:02 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 25 Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Text of Order: Granted Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lat) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Leave to File
Fri 10/06 2:44 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss filed by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Intent to Surreply
Mon 09/25 10:13 AM
Notice of Intent to Surreply to Reply to Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to Motion to Dismiss . Surreply Follow Up on 10/10/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Objection to Motion
Fri 09/22 4:48 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cybergun, S.A.. (Lucic, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Discovery Plan
Wed 09/20 10:04 AM
Proposed Discovery Plan Joint Discovery Plan filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Discovery Plan
Tue 09/19 2:50 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan Joint filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Rouvalis, Mark) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Attorney Appearance
Mon 09/11 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan C. Carrier on behalf of Cybergun, S.A. Attorney Megan C. Carrier added to party Cybergun, S.A.(pty:dft).(Carrier, Megan) |
|
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Mon 09/11 8:37 AM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:19 Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection filed by Sig Sauer, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko) |
||
notice
Intent to Reply
Mon 09/11 9:32 AM
ORAL Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to17 MOTION to Dismiss . Follow up on Reply on 9/25/2017.(de) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
22
pgs
respm
Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection
Fri 09/08 4:44 PM
MEMORANDUM re18 Objection to Motion to Dismiss filed by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Rouvalis, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) (A) Steven Shawver, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) (B) Alexandra Geiger, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit (1) to Geiger Affidavit (Cybergun Webpage), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit (Affidavit) (C) Joseph Huston, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit (Affidavit) (D) Thomas Bedoiseau | ||
18 | 18
respm
Objection to Motion
Fri 09/08 4:31 PM
OBJECTION to17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.. (Rouvalis, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Rescheduling Hearing Notice
Tue 09/05 3:39 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing. Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 9/20/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw) |
||
Sunday, September 03, 2017 | ||
notice
Rescheduling Hearing Notice
Sun 09/03 8:30 AM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing re: Notice of Pretrial Conference,. Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 9/13/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jbw) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Mon 08/28 9:38 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cybergun, S.A.. Follow up on Objection on 9/8/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lucic, Robert) Modified on 8/28/2017 to edit the follow up on objection deadline per the court's 8/25/2017 order to 9/8/2017 re:16 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object. (jbw) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law | ||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Fri 08/25 2:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Assented to MOTION to Amend 14 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss). Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2017.(jbw) |
||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond
Fri 08/25 2:41 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re 14 Motion to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) to 09/08/2017. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Objection on 9/8/2017. (jbw) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time to Object/Respond
Tue 08/22 4:43 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to14 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) to 09/08/2017 filed by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Amend
Tue 08/22 1:56 PM
Assented to MOTION to Amend14 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum of Law | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Wed 08/16 3:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) filed by Cybergun, S.A.. Follow up on Objection on 8/30/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lucic, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit (Affidavit) Ex. 2 | ||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Wed 08/16 9:02 PM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:14 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) filed by Cybergun, S.A. Exhibits A, B, and C filed with Exhibit Affidavit of Robert Lucic should have been filed as separate attachments (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1587.(jbw) |
||
notice
Pretrial Conference
Wed 08/16 9:07 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2017 02:00 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/8/2017. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jbw) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Wed 08/02 8:15 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 16, 2017 filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Wed 08/02 4:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 16, 2017. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/16/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jbw) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Wed 07/19 8:07 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to August 2, 2017. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 8/2/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(jbw) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Mon 07/17 2:24 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 2, 2017 (THIS REPLACES DOCUMENT 11) filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Mon 07/17 2:06 PM
Filed in error - wrong document attached. See corrected filing, document no. 12. Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to August 2, 2017 filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) Modified on 7/17/2017 to add filed in error language. (jbw) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Wed 06/28 9:15 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 19, 2017 filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Wed 06/28 8:31 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to July 19, 2017. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/19/2017. (jbw) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Wed 05/24 10:21 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to July 5, 2017 filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Thu 05/25 8:22 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to July 5, 2017. Text of Order: Granted. Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 7/5/2017. (jbw) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Wed 04/26 3:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Service filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.(Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Service, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Service | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Thu 04/20 10:14 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to June 5, 2017 filed by Cybergun, S.A..(Lucic, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/20 10:11 AM
Disclosure Statement by Cybergun, S.A. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Lucic, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/20 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of Cybergun, S.A. Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party Cybergun, S.A.(pty:dft).(Lucic, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Thu 04/20 12:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to June 5, 2017 re 1 Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(Answer Follow Up on 6/5/2017.)(jbw) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
AO 120 Patent/Trademark
Fri 01/13 2:04 PM
AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark forwarded this date to the Commissioner on Patents and Trademarks, Washington, DC.(lml) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons - Waiver Issued
Fri 01/13 10:10 AM
Summons issued electronically as to Cybergun, S.A. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(lml) |
|
Att: 1 Notice ECF | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Fri 01/13 10:07 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] .(lml) |
||
notice
ECF - Filing Error - Info Only
Fri 01/13 10:11 AM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:1 Complaint - New Case, filed by Sig Sauer, Inc.,2 Disclosure Statement filed by Sig Sauer, Inc. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lml) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/12 9:16 PM
Disclosure Statement by Sig Sauer, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint - New Case
Thu 01/12 9:12 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1465999 filed by Sig Sauer, Inc..(Geiger, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Cybergun 2015 Catalog, pgs. 61-62, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Photos of Cybergun Products from Wal-Mart, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Cybergun 2015 Catalog, pgs. 16 and 159, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons - Waiver | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Fri 01/13 10:07 AM
Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-014-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (lml) |