Bowling v. Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Referred: | Stephanie K Bowman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00031 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 5:01 AM EDT |
Defendant
Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC
3260 Chateau Drive
Portsmouth, OH 45662 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dakoda Bowling
37 State Route 784
South Shore, KY 41175 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/31 3:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Dakoda Bowling. (Stepter, Rayl) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 05/26 11:36 AM
Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman assigned for referral purposes. (ba) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order
Thu 05/25 4:32 PM
CALENDAR ORDER: Parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by 6/7/2017. Deadline to move to amend pleadings and/or add parties set for 7/3/2017. Deadline for the filing of motions relative to the pleadings set for 8/1/2017. Fact Discovery deadline set for 12/15/2017. Deadline for disclosure of non-expert (fact) witnesses set for 9/30/2017. Dispositive motion deadline set for 1/15/2018. Expert deadlines (if necessary): (a) Deadline for Plaintiff to identify expert witnesses on damages and provide expert reports: 30 days after ruling on dispositive motion; (b) Deadline for Defendant to identify expert witnesses and provide expert reports: 30 days after Plaintiff's disclosure; (c) Deadline for rebuttal experts and reports: 21 days after Defendant's disclosure; (d) Deadline for all expert discovery: 120 days after ruling on dispositive motion. The Final Pretrial Conference and Trial dates will be scheduled by Judge Barrett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/25/2017. (km) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 05/25 10:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 5/25/2017. Attorney Rayl Steper appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Robert Shank appeared on behalf of Defendant. Calendar Order to follow. Parties reminded to seek a referral to mediation should they desire a court conducted mediation. Parties also reminded to call chambers re: any discovery disputes that may arise in lieu of filing a motion to compel. (km) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Telephone Conference
Tue 05/09 9:05 AM
NOTICE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Counsel shall call 1-888-363-4749 to participate in the telephone conference with Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. The conference access code is 8651321 and the security code is 2010. NOTE: You will be required to use this information each time the Court conducts a telephone conference unless otherwise instructed. (km) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 05/08 10:47 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Joint Discovery Plan by Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC. (Shank, Robert) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/20 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rayl L Stepter for Plaintiff Dakoda Bowling (Stepter, Rayl) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Deadline
Fri 03/31 9:09 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 5/8/2017. (km) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/30 3:56 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/30/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/27 1:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Shank, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/23 2:37 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James J Hux terminated. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/23/17. (copy of this order is sent to plaintiff at 37 State Route 784, South Shore, KY 41175 (ba) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/20 1:58 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint; Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC answer due 3/27/2017. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/20/17. (ba) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/08 1:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC. (Shank, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/06 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC (Pryor, Patricia) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/06 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shank for Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC (Shank, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/03 4:50 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer New date requested 3/27/2017. by Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC. (Shank, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/03 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shank for Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC (Shank, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/03 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Anderson Pryor for Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC (Pryor, Patricia) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Fri 02/24 9:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT re5 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Dakoda Bowling. (Hux, James) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/14 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC. Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC served on 2/11/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (bjc) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/10 3:07 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Dakoda Bowling. (Hux, James) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Thu 01/19 4:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Certified Mailing of Complaint and Summons Pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (bc) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 01/18 4:33 PM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN030494 (eh) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/13 8:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC. (jlw) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 01/13 8:30 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Portsmouth Emergency Ambulance Service INC (Filing fee $ 400 paid), filed by Dakoda Bowling. (Hux, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form |