Pettus-Brown v. Hamilton County Ohio et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00032 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Defendant
Hamilton County Ohio
|
|
Defendant
Hamilton County Prosecutor
|
|
Plaintiff
LaShawn R. Pettus-Brown
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 02/13 5:23 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT filed concurrently with5 Order signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/13/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 02/13 5:22 PM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re2 Report and Recommendation dismissing1 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/13/17. (ba)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 02/08 10:38 AM
ORDER denying plaintiff's3 Motion for a refund of the filing fee. The Clerk of Court is Directed to provide plaintiff with a cop of the pleading that he filed to initiate this action which is docketed as1 in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/8/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 02/08 10:46 AM
Document1 copied and issued by Clerk to plaintiff pursuant to Order of the Court4 . (art) |
||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/31 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Withdraw (Bill in Chancery/Equity) and MOTION for Return of Documents and Refund of Filing Fee by Plaintiff LaShawn R. Pettus-Brown. (bc) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 01/23 7:26 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's pleading entitled1 "Bill in Chancery/Equity and Injunctive Relief" be Dismissed with prejudice, with the caveat that the dismissal may not be construed as precluding plaintiff from filing a habeas petition challenging any conviction or sentence he may receive in Hamilton County Court of Common Pleas Case No. B1605805 after he has exhausted all available state-court remedies. Any appeal of this matter would not be taken in good faith, and therefore Deny plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 1/20/2017. (art)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
File Document Under Seal
Thu 01/12 3:29 PM
MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff LaShawn R. Pettus-Brown. (eh) (eh). (eh) |
|
Att: 1 (1/12/2017) Original Bill in Chancery Equity and Injunctive Relief, | ||
Att: 2 (1/12/2017) Bill in Chancerty/Equity and Injunctive Relief, | ||
Att: 3 (1/12/2017) Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 (1/12/2017) Filing Fee Receipt | ||
Att: 5 (1/12/2017) Summons | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 01/25 9:43 AM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 100CIN030462 (sct) |