Brand et al v. Reliant et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00034 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Commerce Union Bank
1736 Carothers Parkway
Brentwood, TN 37172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reliant Bank
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Matthew J Kunsman
Fisher, Skrobot & Sheraw, LLC 471 East Broad Street, Suite 1810
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Brand
2605 Laramie Street
Irving, TX 75062 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Brand
7512 Summitview Drive
Irving, TX 75063 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Commerce Union
Terminated: 06/29/2017
1736 Carothers Parkway
Brentwood, TN 37172 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reliant
Terminated: 06/29/2017
711 East Main Street
Hendersonville, TN 37075 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 05 2017
ORDER granting 23 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 5, 2017. (jlk) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 12/06 3:54 PM
Case transferred to District of Tennessee Middle. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 12/06 5:34 PM
Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Middle District of Tennessee as case 3:17-cv-01527, filed 12/06/2017. (sem) |
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Change Venue
Tue 12/05 4:43 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Tennessee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 5, 2017. (jlk) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/22 9:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re46 First MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Derrick, Aliaquanda) |
|
46 | 46
motion
Stay
Wed 11/22 2:53 PM
First MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Reliant Bank. (Pyers, Zachary) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 11/16 12:33 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 11/16/2017. (ds) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 11:39 AM
ORDER - Counsel to email the undersigned's Courtroom Deputy, Sherry Nichols, at Sherry_Nichols@ohsd.uscourts.gov by November 14, 2017 to advise her if this case should not be set for the December 11-15, 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/7/2017. (sln) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/20 10:45 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re38 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Defendant Reliant Bank. (df) Modified text on 9/20/2017 (df) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Reply (non motion)
Tue 09/19 3:58 PM
Reply re38 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Reliant Bank. (Pyers, Zachary) |
|
42 | 42
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 09/19 12:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re39 MOTION Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery re20 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Defendant Reliant Bank. (Pyers, Zachary) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 09/01 3:33 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re32 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/4/2017. Motion for Ten-Day Extension to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to Middle District of Tennessee New date requested 9/4/2017. filed by Defendants Commerce Union, Commerce Union Bank, Reliant, Reliant Bank. (Pyers, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 08/30 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Zachary Benjamin Pyers substituting for Tyler Tarney as to Defendants Commerce Union Bank, Reliant Bank. (Pyers, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/29 9:16 PM
MOTION Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery re20 Order on Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Derrick, Aliaquanda) |
|
38 | 38
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/29 9:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Derrick, Aliaquanda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/25 4:33 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to23 MOTION to Change Venue Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 25, 2017. (jlk) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 08/25 11:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re23 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to Middle District of Tennessee filed by Defendants Commerce Union, Commerce Union Bank, Reliant, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 08/24 9:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/4/2017. Motion for Ten-Day Extension to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to Middle District of Tennessee New date requested 9/4/2017. filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Derrick, Aliaquanda) |
|
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/24 4:05 PM
ORDER - Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a written response to32 Defendants Motion for Ten-Day Extension no later than AUGUST 25, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. EDT. Defendant's deadline to reply in support of their Motion to Transfer Venue is suspended pending resolution of the Motion for Ten-Day Extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 24, 2017. (jlk) |
|
33 | 33
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 08/24 3:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Reply in Support of Defendants' Reliant Bank and Commerce Union Bank Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendants Commerce Union, Commerce Union Bank, Reliant, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/24 2:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 9/4/2017. Motion for Ten-Day Extension to File Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to Middle District of Tennessee New date requested 9/4/2017. ( Responses due by 9/14/2017) by Defendants Commerce Union, Commerce Union Bank, Reliant, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/11 12:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to Middle District of Tennessee filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Derrick, Aliaquanda) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 08/10 4:32 PM
ORDER granting29 Motion for Extension of Time. Reliant Bank'sdeadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is hereby extended until August 24,2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 10, 2017. (jlk) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/10 1:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/24/2017. Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Commerce Union, Commerce Union Bank, Reliant, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Tue 08/08 1:47 PM
ORDER - re23 Motion to Change Venue filed by Reliant Bank, Commerce Union Bank. Deadline for responding to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 23) is EXTENDED to AUGUST 15, 2017. Defendants reply, if any, is due within rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 8, 2017. (jlk) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 08/08 4:44 PM
Filing fee Received: $200, receipt number 200COL48449. (df) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/01 5:02 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aliaquanda Derrick. Plaintiffs Motion to Designate Trial Attorney is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Attorney Aliaquanda Derrick may serve as trial attorney for the purposes of all pretrial proceedings. (Id.) Should the case proceed to trial, counsels status as trial attorney will be at the discretion of the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 1, 2017.(jlk) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/31 3:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Robol, Richard) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Mon 07/31 3:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Aliquanda Derrick by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Robol, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/31 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T Robol for Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand (Robol, Richard) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Change Venue
Thu 07/13 4:35 PM
MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to Middle District of Tennessee by Defendants Commerce Union Bank, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 07/11 5:12 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Withdraw by Attorney Matthew Jared Kunsman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/11/17. (sem) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Protective Order
Mon 07/10 4:37 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/10/2017. (sln) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 07/07 3:17 PM
ORDER granting19 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/7/17. (sem) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/07 3:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Plaintiffs' Response now due by 7/31/2017 (sem) |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stay
Thu 07/06 3:54 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and Extend Time for Response by Defendants Commerce Union Bank, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/06 2:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Commerce Union Bank, Reliant Bank, Reliant Bank, Reliant Bank, Commerce Union Bancshares, Inc., Commerce Union Bancshares, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Reliant Bank, Corporate Parent Commerce Union Bancshares, Inc. for Commerce Union Bank, Reliant Bank.. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 06/30 9:43 AM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants Commerce Union, Commerce Union Bank, Reliant, Reliant Bank. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Thu 06/29 2:18 PM
ORDER - By agreement of the parties: (1) Reliant Bank is herebysubstituted as a party Defendant in place of Reliant; and (2) Commerce Union Bank is hereby substituted as a party Defendant in place of Commerce Union. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 29, 2017. (jlk) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Tue 06/20 4:39 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 6/30/2017 . Motions to Amend due by 6/30/2017 . Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2017 . Any motion addressing personal jurisdiction, subject matter jurisdiction, or venue must be filed by 7/15/2017 . Primary Expert due by 1/1/2018 . Rebuttal Expert due by 3/1/2018 . Discovery due by 4/1/2018 . Dispositive motions due by 6/1/2018 . Final Pretrial Conference ready in December 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/20/2017. (kdp) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/20 3:54 PM
NOTICE by Movant Matthew J Kunsman re13 Order, (Kunsman, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 06/19 3:42 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff has 21 days to file a response to12 Motion to Withdraw. Plaintiffs counsel is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiffs, and to certify on the record that he has done so. Such proof of service shall state the date and manner of service, including the name of the person(s) served and the address(es) to which service was directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 19, 2017. (jlk) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 06/19 11:18 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Movant Matthew J Kunsman. (Kunsman, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew J. Kunsman | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Tue 06/20 3:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/31/2017. (sln) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 05/23 9:57 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. (Kunsman, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/22 1:53 PM
Answer of Defendants Reliant and Commerce Union to Plaintiffs' Complaint ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/28 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HEARING: Preliminary Pretrial Conference reset to 5/31/2017 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (Previously set for 5/16/2017.) (sln) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/28 9:42 AM
Reset Deadline: Answer to complaint due by 5/22/2017. (sln) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/26 4:15 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/22/2017. Stipulation for Twenty-One Day Extension for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Commerce Union, Reliant. (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/20 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2017 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/19 8:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Tarney for Defendants Commerce Union, Reliant (Tarney, Tyler) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 01/13 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Commerce Union and Reliant. (sem) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Form | ||
4 | 4
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Fri 01/13 2:57 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. AMENDED SUMMONS IN CIVIL ACTION . (Kunsman, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Fri 01/13 2:55 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Crystal Brand, James Brand. AMENDED SUMMONS IN CIVIL ACTION . (Kunsman, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/13 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons re1 Complaint. (sem) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5797135), filed by James Brand, Crystal Brand. (Kunsman, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form |