Curry v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Newman |
Referred: | Michael J Newman |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00010 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/06 5:09 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Debra A Curry. (McDonald, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 06/05 10:48 AM
NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's unopposed second motion for an extension of time (doc.12 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the Statement of Errors on or before 7/3/2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/5/2017. (mnr) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/26 4:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/3/2017. by Plaintiff Debra A Curry. (McDonald, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 04/25 4:35 PM
NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiffs unopposed motion for extension of time (doc. 10) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a Statement of Specific Errors on or before June 3, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/25/2017. (dm) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 04/21 4:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/3/2017. to File Plaintiff's Statement of Specific Errors by Plaintiff Debra A Curry. (McDonald, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/13 4:52 PM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman. Signed by Judge Walter H. Rice on 4/13/17. (pb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Tue 03/21 9:07 AM
NOTATION ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to comply with the provisions set forth in the Seventh Amended Magistrate Judge's General Order No. 11 (effective 4/26/16). General Order No. 11 can be found at http://www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/content/general-orders-ohio-southern-district. Specifically, the parties are directed to paragraph 2 that requires citations to the PageID in the administrative record. Further, prior to filing a memorandum in opposition, the Commissioner shall determine whether remand is appropriate and, if so, shall file a motion for remand in lieu of a memorandum in opposition. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/21/2017. (cg) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Mon 03/20 10:46 AM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/4/2017. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 court transcript index, | ||
Att: 2 documents related to administrative process, | ||
Att: 3 payment documents and decisions, | ||
Att: 4 jurisdictional documents and notices, | ||
Att: 5 nondisability related development, | ||
Att: 6 disability related development, | ||
Att: 7 medical records part 1, | ||
Att: 8 medical records part 2, | ||
Att: 9 medical records part 3, | ||
Att: 10 medical records part 4, | ||
Att: 11 medical records part 5, | ||
Att: 12 medical records part 6 | ||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/16 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yvette S Sanders-Guyton for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sanders-Guyton, Yvette) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 01/27 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/17/2017, answer due 3/20/2017. (McDonald, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 01/13 8:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of General Counsel. (jmb) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 8:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Debra A Curry. (jmb) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/13 8:21 AM
NOTATION ORDER GRANTING1 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/13/2017. (dm) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 01/12 12:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Debra A Curry. (McDonald, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Text of Proposed Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Form |