eTech Parts, LLC
Kansas Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert D Berger |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-20049 |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Debtor
eTech Parts, LLC
PO Box 26426
Overland Park, KS 66225-6426 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Steven R Rebein
Law Office of Steven R. Rebein, L.C. 8700 Monrovia, Suite 310
Lenexa, KS 66215 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202 |
Docket last updated: 01/13/2017 12:03 AM CST |
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Thu 01/12 5:13 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card ) 17-20049 [misc,volp7cc] ( 335.00). Receipt number 13602656,amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
AAutoAsignJudge7
Thu 01/12 5:13 PM
|
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )
Thu 01/12 5:11 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by eTech Parts, LLC Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 01/19/2017. (Stutz, Joanne) |
|
2 | 2
misc
DeBN Request Form
Thu 01/12 5:21 PM
DeBN Request Form: Initial Activation Request for the Debtor Filed by Debtor eTech Parts, LLC. (Stutz, Joanne) |