Professional Driver Services Inc
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Scott C Clarkson |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-10108 |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Debtor
Professional Driver Services Inc
9091 Holder St
Cypress, CA 90630-5861 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 01/13/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 01/12 1:22 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:17-bk-10108) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44031768. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Thu 01/12 1:07 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Professional Driver Services Inc (Hedtke, Neil) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Thu 01/12 1:07 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Professional Driver Services Inc. (Hedtke, Neil) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 01/12 1:12 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Professional Driver Services. Filed by Debtor Professional Driver Services Inc. (Hedtke, Neil) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Thu 01/12 1:22 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Hedtke, Neil) |