Skinner v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00148 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Skinner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/12 1:33 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:16-cv-06445. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. 1/6/17 ENTERED. (kw, ) | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER... that ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THIS ACTION, INCLUDING THE TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND/OR ANY REMAND LITIGATION ("JPML") OF DEFENDANT'S VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., PENDING NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG ACTION AND THE JPML'S DETERMINATION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO MDL 2672 IN THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. IF THIS ACTION IS NOT CONSOLIDATED AND TRANSFERRED TO MDL 2672, DEFENDANT SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN FORTY-FIVE (45) DAYS AFTER THE JPML'S DECISION. APPROVED BY THE COURT:. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 12/21/2016. 12/21/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, ) | |
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent VOLKSWAGEN AG for VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.. by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC..(jwl, ) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. from Common Pleas Lehigh County, case number 2016-3270. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 151771)(jwl, ) | |
Att: 1 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 2 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |