Carll-Young et al v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00149 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia J. Carll-Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher M. Hornyak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather M. Hornyak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jonathan Lauth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tyla Lauth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Collie James Mangano, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel B. McRae
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shannon McRae
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felicia M. Miyakawa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James D. Simons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James A. Szumera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen S. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/08 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by James A. Szumera (Shaw, Ethan) |
|
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/09 7:35 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Request for Removal from Service List filed by James A. Szumera. Responses due by 1/23/2019. Replies due by 1/30/2019.(Fishback, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/09 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Robert Carr, Christopher M. Hornyak, Heather M. Hornyak, Jonathan Lauth, Tyla Lauth, Collie James Mangano, III, Daniel B. McRae, Shannon McRae, Felicia M. Miyakawa, Karen S. Williams (Shaw, Ethan) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/05 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by James D. Simons (Shaw, Ethan) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/05 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Patricia J. Carll-Young (Shaw, Ethan) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/12 1:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:16-cv-01321. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(jf) | |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Tyla Lauth, James D. Simons, Christopher M. Hornyak, Collie James Mangano, III, Shannon McRae, James A. Szumera, Robert Carr, Daniel B. McRae, Patricia J. Carll-Young, Heather M. Hornyak, Karen S. Williams, Felicia M. Miyakawa, Jonathan Lauth.(Shaw, Ethan) Modified text on 1/4/2017 (jf). Modified relationship on 1/4/2017 (jf). | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER DECEMBER 20, 2016 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Hartline, C.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd) | |
2 | 2 Letters to Jeffrey L. Chase, Michael B. Gallub, Robert J. Giuffra, Sharon L. Nelles and William B. Monahan re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) | |
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9136368), filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Hartline, C.) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet - Attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet-Supplement, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet-Supplemental-Attachment, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Index - State Court Docs, | ||
Att: 6 Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Plfs' Original Petition, | ||
Att: 8 Citation and Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 9 VWGoA's Original Answer, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit C | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Patricia J. Carll-Young, Robert Carr, Christopher M. Hornyak, Heather M. Hornyak, Jonathan Lauth, Tyla Lauth, Collie James Mangano, III, Daniel B. McRae, Shannon McRae, Felicia M. Miyakawa, James D. Simons, James A. Szumera, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Karen S. Williams. (afd) |