Wright v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00150 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Audi of America LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Wright
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 10/09 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Alexander Wright (Shaw, Ethan) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/12 1:42 PM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:16-cv-01326. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-78). MDL No. 2672 Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (dm) | |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Audi of America, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. amending, filed by Alexander Wright.(Shaw, Ethan) | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER DECEMBER 21, 2016 by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Hartline, C.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (afd) | |
2 | 2 Letters to Jeffrey L. Chase, Michael B. Gallub, Robert J. Giuffra, Sharon L. Nelles and William B. Monahan re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd) | |
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9140962), filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc..(Hartline, C.) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet - Attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet - Supp, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet - Supp - Attachment, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Index - State Court Docs, | ||
Att: 6 Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Plf's Original Petition, | ||
Att: 8 Citations and Affidavits of Service, | ||
Att: 9 VWGoA's and Audi's Original Answer, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit C | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd) | ||
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Alexander Wright. (afd) |