Presidio Health, Inc. -v- Excel ER Physicians, PLLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00171 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Counter-claimant
Excel ER Physicians, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
Presidio Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Excel ER Physicians, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Presidio Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 02/23 2:51 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 2/23/2018) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 11/03 9:59 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 37 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings; Continuing Case Management Conference. If no Stipulation for Dismissal is filed, a Case Management Statement is due by 2/26/2018. Case Management Conference continued to 3/5/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 11/02 3:04 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC.(Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 11/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Johnathan E. Collins in Support of Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/27 2:06 PM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement or Stipulation for Dismissal due by 11/27/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/27/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2017) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/25 3:31 PM
NOTICE by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC Notice of Settlement (Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 07/19 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnathan Edwards Collins (Collins, Johnathan) (Filed on 7/19/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 05/30 12:58 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 32 Stipulation and Proposed Order Requesting to Extend Setting of Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/02/2017 at 1:30 p.m. before United States Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The deadlines associated with the Initial Case Management Conference will be continued according to the new setting. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 5/30/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 05/26 2:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Setting of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC.(Kress, Lindsey) (Filed on 5/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation and Request to Extend Setting of Initial Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan E. Collins | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/14 12:24 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Johnathan Collins. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/13 12:54 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11312636.) filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC.(Collins, Johnathan) (Filed on 4/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Wed 04/12 10:06 AM
ORDER Re: Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/12/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 04/11 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Regina Jill McClendon (McClendon, Regina) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 04/06 11:24 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 25 Stipulation to Extend Setting of Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 6/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR
Thu 04/06 11:21 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 23 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 04/05 12:08 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 4/5/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Tue 04/04 1:22 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Presidio Health, Inc. (Skaggs, Jason) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
Tue 04/04 9:48 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC filed by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/04 9:39 AM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Use Event STIPULATIONS - Stipulations and Proposed Order Selecting Private ADR . Please re-file in its entirety. Re:21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Mon 04/03 12:00 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 4/3/2017) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Mon 04/03 7:20 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC.(Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 4/3/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Page | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Tue 02/07 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim byPresidio Health, Inc.. (Skaggs, Jason) (Filed on 2/7/2017) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/06 9:39 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Raymond L. Panneton. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/06 9:31 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Benjamin L. Hisey. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 02/03 12:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Presidio Health, Inc. (Skaggs, Jason) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 02/03 12:30 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Presidio Health, Inc... (Skaggs, Jason) (Filed on 2/3/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/02 2:23 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11125768.) filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC.(Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/02 2:14 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11125661.) filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC.(Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 2/2/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/26 12:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC.. (Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Wed 01/25 6:56 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC (Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 1/25/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Thu 01/19 1:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Presidio Health, Inc. byExcel ER Physicians, PLLC.(Hendershot, Simon) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/17 2:01 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Katherine Tempone Cowart. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/17 1:58 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Simon W. Hendershot, III. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/16 10:30 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Katherine Tempone Cowart ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11076362.) filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (Holl, Kevin) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/16 10:29 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re Simon W. Hendershot, III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11076358.) filed by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (Holl, Kevin) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 01/13 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,4 ADR Order. (Holl, Kevin) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 01/13 10:25 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Excel ER Physicians East Texas, LLC, Excel ER Physicians, PLLC re1 Notice of Removal, and Standing Order for Magistrate Judge Kim. (Holl, Kevin) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (ysS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/13 8:45 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/12 2:48 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC . (Holl, Kevin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/12 2:35 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2017. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/12 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-16-555175. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11070786). Filed byExcel ER Physicians, PLLC, a Texas Professional Limited Liabilty Company.(Holl, Kevin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 01/12 2:38 PM
Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] Please use Current Civil Cover Sheet, which can be located at www.cand.uscourts.gov.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety ONLY Re:[1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Excel ER Physicians, PLLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |