McMahon v. San Francisco Police Department et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00174 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
City & County of San Francisco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mikayla Oconnell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
San Francisco Police Department
|
|
Mediator
Louis A. Leone
Leone & Alberts 2175 N. California Blvd. Suite 900
Walnut Creek, CA 94596 |
|
Plaintiff
Helena McMahon
1390 Market Street Suite 200
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Represented By
|
GPO
May 11 2017
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/11/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Costs Taxed
Wed 03/21 3:43 PM
Costs Taxed in the amount of $973.35 against Helena McMahon. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Bill of Costs
Wed 10/25 3:54 PM
BILL OF COSTS and Exhibits A to C by City & County of San Francisco. Objections due by 11/8/2017. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 10/25/2017) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
oth_evt
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 10/12 7:04 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017) |
|
35 | 35
8
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 10/12 6:58 PM
ORDER GRANTING 25 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/12/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 09/27 6:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 9/27/2017 re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court expects to issue a written order granting defendant's motion for summary judgment. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney: Edwin Bradley. Defendant Attorney: James F. Hannawalt. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2017) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Mon 09/11 8:55 AM
REPLY filed byCity & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 9/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 09/07 10:21 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Complete version with previously unscanned pages filed byHelena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 9/7/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 09/06 9:27 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Declaration of Edwin Bradley with Exhibits filed byHelena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 09/06 9:25 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byHelena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
29 | 29
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 09/06 9:24 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Memorandum Opposing Motion filed byHelena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Wed 08/23 2:55 PM
Declaration of James F. Hannawalt in Support of27 Brief,25 MOTION for Summary Judgment Errata Declaration and Exhibit A filed byCity & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 8/23/2017) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
oth_sup
Brief
Tue 08/22 5:57 PM
Brief re26 Brief,25 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #26 filed byCity & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 8/22/2017) |
|
26 | 26
oth_sup
Brief
Tue 08/22 5:36 PM
Brief re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 8/22/2017) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 08/22 5:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/5/2017. Replies due by 9/12/2017.(Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 8/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of James Hannawalt, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mikayla Connell, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to C to Hannawalt Dec | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Certification of ADR Session
Tue 07/18 2:34 PM
Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Louis A. Leone: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on July 14, 2017. The case partially settled. Further facilitated discussions are expected after the MSJ is heard. Mediation process is ongoing. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/27 1:55 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing reset to 7/14/2017 10:00 AM., at the law offices of Leone & Alberts, 2175 North California Blvd., Suite 900, Walnut Creek, CA 94596 (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 06/05 4:21 PM
Order Re Mental and Physical Examinations by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 22 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 06/02 11:50 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Mental and Physical Examinations filed by City & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 6/2/2017) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 05/22 3:25 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM., at the law offices of Leone & Alberts, 2175 North California Blvd., Suite 900, Walnut Creek, CA 94596 (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
adr
Pre MED phone conference
Fri 05/12 2:30 PM
Pre MED phone conference scheduled on May 22, 2017, at 1:00 PM. Parties should contact mediator's office by May 18, 2017, to confirm availability for the call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Pretrial Order
Thu 05/11 2:41 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/11/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
19 | 19
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Thu 05/11 9:07 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Louis A. Leone as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/09 6:42 PM
NOTICE by City & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell of Unavailability of Counsel (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 5/9/2017) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 04/19 10:11 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2017. Case referred to ADR Unit for mediation to occur within 90 days. Deadline to Amend/Add Parties: 8/1/2017. Close of Fact Discovery: 12/1/2017. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 2/28/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2018 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 5/29/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 2:10-2:14. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2017) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
adr
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held
Thu 04/13 8:32 AM
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on 4/12/2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Tue 04/11 10:34 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 4/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 03/23 12:23 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
13 | 13
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
Thu 03/23 12:22 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, April 12, 2017, at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
12 | 12
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Thu 03/23 8:51 AM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) by CCSF, OConnell & McMahon (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
11 | 11
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 03/23 8:49 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by CCSF and OConnell (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/15 10:50 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMikayla Oconnell. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 2/15/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/09 8:02 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity & County of San Francisco. (Hannawalt, James) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 01/20 3:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Scheduling Order served on San Francisco Police Department; City & County of San Francisco; Mikayla Oconnell on 01/20/2017, filed by Helena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 1/20/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Errata
Tue 01/17 3:17 PM
ERRATA re1 Complaint,, omitted page 8 to complaint by Helena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/17 9:17 AM
Summons Issued as to City & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell, San Francisco Police Department. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 01/17 9:13 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/13/17.(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/13 1:53 PM
Case assigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 01/13 6:42 AM
Electronic filing error. Judge will not be randomly assigned to case due to Filing fee not being paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil ; Other Documents ; New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. Re:1 Complaint filed by Helena McMahon (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 01/13 1:52 PM
Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 34611121423. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 01/12 5:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT with Civil Case Cover Sheet against All Defendants. Filed byHelena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/12 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT against San Francisco Police Department, City & County of San Francisco, Mikayla Oconnell. Filed byHelena McMahon. (Bradley, Edwin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |