5
|
|
5
order
Order Relating Case
Wed 01/18 2:51 PM
ORDER RELATING CASES C14-3616 LB, C16-3371 LB, and C17-138 DMR. The court relates the case. Given the parties' representations about consenting to the court's jurisdiction at the cmc hearing, the court asks the parties to formalize their consent by January 23, 2017. The consent forms are attached. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/18/2017.(rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Consent Form
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 01/12 8:46 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2017 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
NOTICE by Sarah Murphy, Elana Pera of Filing Opt-In Consent Forms (Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against Saw Entertainment Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11067500.). Filed byElana Pera, Sarah Murphy.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|