Baker v. Yahoo, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00135 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 27, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Yahoo ! Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tabitha Baker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Wed 07/22 3:36 PM
Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/22/20. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Tue 07/21 4:06 PM
Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/21/20. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 02/07 2:45 PM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh in case 5:16-cv-05456-LHK; denying (246) Motion to Certify Class; denying (248) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (301) Motion ; denying (302) Motion ; denying (303) Motion ; denying (304) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:16-md-02752-LHK. (sp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 02/09 5:39 PM
Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh in Case 5:16-cv-05456-LHK Granting (19) Joint Application for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee; Denying (21) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; Denying (23) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel; Denying (24) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 5:16-md-02752-LHK; denying (12) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 5:16-cv-07264-LHK. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 02/09 5:10 PM
Order Consolidating Cases. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 2/9/17. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
11 | 11
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 02/09 3:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lucy H. Koh: Motion Hearing held on 2/9/2017 re ( 21 in 5:16-md-02752-LHK) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, ( 23 in 5:16-md-02752-LHK) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, ( 24 in 5:16-md-02752-LHK) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Court to issue written order. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez. For Plaintiff(s): John Yanchunis, Shimon Yiftach, Jennifer Joost, Gayle Blatt, Marc Seltzer, Deval Zaveri, Stuart Davidson, Ariana Tadler, Karen Riebel and David Straite. For Defendant(s): Sam Danon, John Delionado and Ann Mortimer. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2017) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Mon 01/30 11:23 AM
**CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case re-assignment to Judge Lucy Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/2/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/13 9:06 AM
ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting (39) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:16-md-02752-LHK. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 01/12 1:24 PM
Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:16-cv-04601. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
7 | 7
misc
ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
Thu 01/12 9:32 AM
Certified Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to USDC Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL 2752. (ddm) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER granting the parties'4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The deadline for Yahoo to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to the later of: (i) forty-five (45) days after a Consolidated Complaint is filed in the Yahoo MDL or as otherwise ordered by Judge Koh as the MDL transferee judge; or (ii) sixty (60) days from the date this Consent Motion is granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/3/17. (ddm) | |
5 | 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yahoo, Inc.with Jury Demand, filed by Tabitha Baker.(Miller, Harlan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Yahoo, Inc..(Beach, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE Of Filing amended and substituted civil cover sheet by Tabitha Baker re1 Complaint,(Miller, Harlan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet amended and substituted | ||
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Yahoo, Inc. (bdb) | |
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tabitha Baker. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-6868357.) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |