Gray v. Trans Union LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00165 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Vogl Meredith Burke LLP 456 Montgomery Street 20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Gray
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/21 10:38 AM
ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/21/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 04/19 8:32 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Trans Union LLC. (Ferguson, Christopher) (Filed on 4/19/2017) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 03/24 8:44 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/27/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/20/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/24/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 10:17 AM
NOTICE by Trans Union LLC Of Settlement (Joint) (Ferguson, Christopher) (Filed on 3/23/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Wed 03/08 9:35 AM
ORDER GRANTING 17 DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT FOR LEAD COUNSEL TO PARTICIPATE IN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/8/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear by Telephone
Tue 03/07 1:41 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone For Lead Counsel To Participate In Initial Case Management Conference filed by Trans Union LLC.(Ferguson, Christopher) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 03/02 5:28 PM
ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Withdraw Pro Hac Vice Admission of Franci G. Fealk, Counsel for Defendant Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/2/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 02/24 2:01 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney For Franci G. Fealk filed by Trans Union LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2017. Replies due by 3/17/2017.(Fealk, Franci) (Filed on 2/24/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 9:24 AM
ORDER Granting 13 Application for Admission of Attorney ro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Ferguson, Counsel for Trans Union LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/23/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/23 9:08 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11178272.) filed by Trans Union LLC.(Ferguson, Christopher) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certficate Of Good Standing - Christopher A. Ferguson | ||
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 01/19 9:37 AM
(Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 01/18 2:42 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/camera. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/18/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 01/18 11:50 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/18 10:25 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Trans Union LLC.. (Fealk, Franci) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Wed 01/18 10:23 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) And Affirmative Defenses byTrans Union LLC. (Fealk, Franci) (Filed on 1/18/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/17 1:07 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) |
|
Monday, January 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/16 8:03 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11076316.) filed by Trans Union LLC.(Fealk, Franci) (Filed on 1/16/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate Of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/13 2:37 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 01/12 3:22 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/26/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/12 1:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 16-cv-304324. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11070554). Filed byTrans Union LLC. (Streza, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 01/12 1:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent GS Capital Partners, Corporate Parent Advent International Corp., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. f/k/a TransUnion Corp., Corporate Parent Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC. (Streza, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/12 1:31 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Trans Union LLC . (Streza, David) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |