Rangel v. Synchrony Bank
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lucy H Koh |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00177 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Synchrony Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Ramon Rangel
982 Mills Court
San Jose, CA 95125 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 05/30 10:34 AM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Dismissing Complaint with Prejudice.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017) (iym, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (5/30/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Dismiss
Sat 05/27 12:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Synchrony Bank. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/9/2017. Replies due by 6/16/2017.(Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/26/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Synchrony Banks Motion To Dismiss For Failure To Amend | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Thu 05/25 11:59 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT * Defendant Synchrony Banks Unilateral Case Management Statement & [Proposed] Order; And Rule 26(F) Report * filed by Synchrony Bank. (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/25/2017) |
|
24 | 24
adr
Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
Thu 05/25 7:07 PM
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/25/2017) |
|
23 | 23
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 05/25 7:01 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed on behalf of Defendant Synchrony Bank (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 5/25/2017) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice
Wed 05/24 12:07 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for More Definite Statement
Mon 04/24 3:54 PM
Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 9 Motion for More Definite Statement.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017) (iym, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2017) Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 03/09 11:17 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE advancing9 Motion for More Definite Statement. Hearing set for 4/27/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Lucy H. Koh. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 02/23 11:32 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled for 6/1/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 02/23 9:31 AM
Remark: on 2/23/2017, the clerk sent via US mail a copy of Dkt. No.15 to pro se plaintiff Juan Ramon Rangel at 982 Mills Court, San Jose, CA 95125. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017) |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 02/22 3:00 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Certificate of Service re: Juan Ramon Rangel re: 17 . (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
17 | 17
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 02/22 2:55 PM
**CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH**Following the case re-assignment to Judge Lucy H. Koh, the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled for 05/24/2017 at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). Motion for More Definite Statement rescheduled to 6/1/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, in San Jose, California. The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
16 | 16
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 02/22 11:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains the Referral Judge in this case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/22/17.(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 02/22 9:59 AM
Order That Case Be Reassigned to a District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/22/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Thu 02/09 4:52 PM
REPLY * Defendant Synchrony Banks Reply In Support Of Its Motion For More Definite Statement And Notice Of Plaintiffs Nonopposition * filed bySynchrony Bank. (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 2/9/2017) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 02/01 12:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/15/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
|
utility
Remark
Wed 02/01 12:30 PM
Remark: on 2/1/2017, the clerk sent via US mail a copy of Dkt. No.13 to pro se plaintiff Juan Ramon Rangel at 982 Mills Court, San Jose, CA 95125. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017) |
||
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 01/26 2:53 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synchrony Bank re7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,11 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, 6 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/26 1:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Synchrony Bank.. (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/26/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 01/19 12:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synchrony Bank re9 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
9 | 9
motion
More Definite Statement
Thu 01/19 11:44 AM
MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Synchrony Bank. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Responses due by 2/2/2017. Replies due by 2/9/2017.(Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/19/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Fri 01/13 3:09 PM
***POSTED IN WRONG CASE-PLEASE DISREGARD*** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified text on 1/13/2017 (dhmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 01/13 7:07 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2017. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 01/13 2:57 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 01/12 11:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Synchrony Bank re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,3 Statement,4 Notice (Other) * Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Removal And Subsequent Documents * (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/12 11:48 PM
NOTICE by Synchrony Bank * Defendant Synchrony Banks Notice Of Related Cases * (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Statement
Thu 01/12 11:39 PM
Statement * Defendant Synchrony Banks Corporate Disclosure Statement * by Synchrony Bank. (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 01/12 11:31 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Synchrony Bank identifying Corporate Parent Synchrony Financial, Other Affiliate Juan Ramon Rangel for Synchrony Bank. (Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 01/12 10:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Jose Superior Court Small Claims Division. Their case number is 16SC067389. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11072419). Filed bySynchrony Bank.(Frampton, Zachary) (Filed on 1/12/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |