Universal North America Insurance Company v. Colosi et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer A Dorsey |
Referred: | George Foley, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00113 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Nicholas Colosi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Victor Colosi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wendy Colosi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marilyn Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Universal North America Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
80 | 80
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 01/07 2:33 PM
ORDER Granting79 Stipulation Dismissing All Claims. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED with prejudice, each side to bear its own fees and costs. All pending motions [ECF Nos.69 ,70 ] are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
79 | 79
motion
Stipulation Dismissal
Fri 01/04 5:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal re 78 Order on Stipulation of Dismissal,,, Minute Order,, by Plaintiff Universal North America Insurance Company. (O'Briant, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
78 | 78
minord
Minute Order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/02 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/2/2019. Re:77 Stipulation for Dismissal of All Claims with Prejudice. On 12/27/18, plaintiff submitted a stipulation for dismissal of all claims with prejudice. Though this document has a signature block for counsel for each party, James Whitmire, Esq., counsel for Nicholas, Victor, and Wendy Colosi, has not signed it. Accordingly, the stipulation 77 is rejected because it lacks a necessary signature. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) |