ME2 Productions, Inc. v. Medes et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Nancy J Koppe |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Diego Gutierrez
|
|
Defendant
Daniel Vasquez
|
|
Defendant
Josh Vanderheyden
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Treto
|
|
Defendant
Steven Olmos
|
|
Defendant
Shannon Mullaney
|
|
Defendant
Archie Mendes
|
|
Defendant
Alisha McKinley
|
|
Defendant
Veronica Hernandez
|
|
Defendant
Joerry Gocong
|
|
Defendant
Michael George
|
|
Defendant
Francis DeLaRosa
|
|
Defendant
Wesley Cardona
|
|
Defendant
Jineane Agee
|
|
Plaintiff
ME2 Productions, Inc.
318 N. Carson Street No. 208
Carson City, NV 89701 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Jesus Sanchez
Terminated: 06/26/2017
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Does
Terminated: 05/22/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
51 | 51
misc
AO 121 Copyright Report
Fri 04/20 12:57 PM
AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (SLD) |
|
Att: 1 Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Order | ||
50 | 50
order
Judgment Default
Fri 04/20 12:52 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc. and against Defendant Archie Mendes. The Court awards statutory damages to the Plaintiff against Defendant Archie Mendes in the amount of $1,500.00. The Court further awards to the Plaintiff against Defendant Archie Mendes fees and costs including reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $6,105.00. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Proposed Order Submission
Thu 04/19 12:47 PM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on47 Proposed Order Submission,46 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, 48 Minute Order,, by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |
|
48 | 48
minord
Minute Order
Thu 04/19 8:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 4/19/2018. Re:47 Proposed Order Submission (no image attached) Plaintiff's proposed default judgment (ECF No. 47) contains an award of attorney's fees that does not match the award authorized by the court's order. Compare (ECF. No. 46) (authorizing an award for fees and costs of $6,105), with (ECF. No. 47) (awarding fees and costs in the amount of $5,625). The court orders counsel for plaintiff to file a revised proposed order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RF) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Proposed Order Submission
Wed 04/18 5:11 PM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on46 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,,, by Plaintiff ME2 Productions, Inc.. (Rainey, Charles) |