VPH Pharmacy, Inc.
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Joel D Applebaum |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-30077 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
VPH Pharmacy, Inc.
5736 Miller Road
Swartz Creek, MI 48473 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 01/12/2017 7:00 PM EST |
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
38
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 01/13 12:32 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1717 Filed by VPH Pharmacy, Inc. Credit Counseling Certificate Due: 01/27/2017. Schedule A/B due 01/27/2017. Schedule D due 01/27/2017. Schedule E/F due 01/27/2017. Schedule G due 01/27/2017. Schedule H due 01/27/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/27/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 01/27/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/27/2017. Chapter 11 Plan due by 05/15/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 05/15/2017. (Dragich, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Bankruptcy Cover Sheet
Fri 01/13 12:33 PM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dragich, David) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 01/13 12:33 PM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dragich, David) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Fri 01/13 12:33 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dragich, David) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motions
Fri 01/13 1:05 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions of the Debtor for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing and Use Cash Collateral, (II) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (III) Granting Certain Related Relief Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. (Dragich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Interim Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Budget | ||
6 | 6
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motions
Fri 01/13 1:11 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Employee Wages and Related Items Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. (Dragich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motions
Fri 01/13 1:21 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Application for Order Under 11 U.S.C. 363 Authorizing the Continued Appointment of Gene R. Kohut as Chief Restructuring Officer of the Debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. (Dragich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Gene Kohut | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 4 Engagement Letter | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition (LBR 1074-1)
Fri 01/13 1:35 PM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Pursuant to LBR 1074-1 Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. . (Dragich, David) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit
Fri 01/13 1:37 PM
Affidavit Re: Gene R. Kohut in Support of Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Pleadings Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc.. (Dragich, David) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Employ
Fri 01/13 1:49 PM
Application to Employ Dalto Consulting, Inc. as Financial Advisors Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. (Dragich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Kenneth Dalto | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 4 Engagement Letter | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/13 2:17 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. . (Dragich, David) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/13 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. . (Dragich, David) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/13 2:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. . (Dragich, David) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/13 2:27 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. . (Dragich, David) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Employ
Fri 01/13 2:54 PM
Application to Employ The Dragich Law Firm PLLC as Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc. (Dragich, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Dragich Declaration | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 4 Engagement Letter | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 5 Certificate of Service | ||
16 | 16
order
Set Hearing
Fri 01/13 3:49 PM
Order Setting Hearing on First Day Motions . Hearing to be held on 1/17/2017 at 03:00 PM Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St. for7 and for6 and for5 , (AGS) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 01/13 4:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Debtor In Possession VPH Pharmacy, Inc.. (Vintevoghel, Amanda) |