Kable Distribution Services, Inc.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Lynch |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-80075 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Debtor
Kable Distribution Services, Inc.
16 South Wesley Avenue
Mt. Morris, IL 61054 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
Lumina Media, LLC
2030 Main Street, Suite 1400
Irvine, CA 92614 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Active Interest Media
5720 Flatiron Parkway
Boulder, CO 80301 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
KSE Sportsman Media, Inc.
f/k/a InterMedia Outdoors, Inc. Attn: Jeffrey Paro, President and CEO 1040 Sixth Avenue, FL 12
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 780 Regent St. Suite 304
Madison, WI 53715 |
Docket last updated: 01/13/2017 12:02 PM CST |
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 01/13 9:41 AM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual Fee Amount $335 Re: Kable Distribution Services, Inc. Filed by Petitioning Creditors(s): Lumina Media, LLC (attorney Scott B. Kitei), Active Interest Media (attorney Scott B. Kitei), KSE Sportsman Media, Inc. (attorney Scott B. Kitei) (Kitei, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/13 9:44 AM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-80075 [misc,invol7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 33664273. Fee Amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |