AZTUC, LLC
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brenda Moody Whinery |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-00376 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
AZTUC, LLC
6011 N Desert Moon Ct
Tucson, AZ 85750-0924 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
82 | 82
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED)
Mon 06/26 9:51 AM
The case having been dismissed; IT IS ORDERED that the case is closed and if a trustee has been appointed, the trustee is discharged from and relieved of his trust. Judge Brenda Moody Whinery (Johns, Alicia) |