Rider v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00041 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
SSA
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly L. Rider
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Mon 03/12 11:54 AM
JUDGMENT. Case Terminated. (ds) |
|
17 | 17
24
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/12 11:51 AM
OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 3/12/2018. (ds) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Reply to Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Wed 08/30 3:58 PM
REPLY to Opposition re10 Statement of Specific Errors by Plaintiff Kimberly L. Rider (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Tue 08/15 3:06 PM
Response in Opposition re10 Statement of Specific Errors by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Reply to Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/30/2017. (Baltz, Shefali) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/12 1:47 PM
Reset Deadlines: Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/18/2017. (sln) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 07/11 12:17 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Statement of Errors. Memorandum in Opposition due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/11/2017. (EPD) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 07/10 5:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/18/2017. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Baltz, Shefali) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 06/16 10:45 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition to Statement of Errors. Memorandum in Opposition due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/16/2017. (EPD) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/19 9:59 AM
Reset Deadlines pursuant to 12: Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 7/19/2017. (ew) |
||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 06/15 9:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/19/2017. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Baltz, Shefali) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Specific Errors
Fri 05/05 4:07 PM
STATEMENT OF SPECIFIC ERRORS by Plaintiff Kimberly L. Rider Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 6/19/2017. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Tue 03/21 8:48 AM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/5/2017. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 court transcript index, | ||
Att: 2 documents related to administrative process, | ||
Att: 3 payment documents and decisions, | ||
Att: 4 jurisdictional documents and notices, | ||
Att: 5 non disability related development, | ||
Att: 6 disability related development, | ||
Att: 7 medical records part 1, | ||
Att: 8 medical records part 2 | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 02/01 10:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/25/2017, answer due 3/27/2017. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 02/01 10:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/23/2017, answer due 3/24/2017. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/01 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shefali Baltz for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Baltz, Shefali) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 01/25 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/20/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 01/17 12:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mas) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/17 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kimberly L. Rider. (mas) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 01/17 12:40 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Commissioner's certified copy of the administrative record due within sixty days. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five days after administrative record is filed. Commissioner's response due within forty-five days after Statement of Errors is filed. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, must be filed fifteen days later. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty days after the administrative record is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/17/2017. (mas) |
|
Att: 1 Consent | ||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 01/13 8:10 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Counsel will complete service) by Plaintiff Kimberly L. Rider. (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form Attorney General, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form US Attorney, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Form Regional Counsel |