Elliott v. First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00042 |
Nature of Suit | 371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending |
Cause | 15:1640 Truth in Lending |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 5:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
First Federal Community Bank of Bucyrus
119 S. Sandusky Ave PO Box 749
Bucyrus, OH 44820 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Ralph Elliott
14829 Maple Ridge Road
Milford Center, OH 43045 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 10/06 2:00 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jlk) |
||
Tuesday, October 05, 2021 | ||
118 | 118
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/05 4:29 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff G. Ralph Elliott re117 Stipulation of Dismissal (Michel, Aaron) |
|
117 | 117
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/05 4:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Truth in Lending Claim by Plaintiff G. Ralph Elliott. (Michel, Aaron) |
|
Friday, October 01, 2021 | ||
116 | 116
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 10/01 4:13 PM
ORDER issued in that the parties are DIRECTED to file a joint, written status report by NOVEMBER 1, 2021, unless an appropriate dismissal motion has been filed prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/1/21. (sem) |