Worth v. Wamsley et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Algenon L Marbley |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2018 |
Defendant
Brenda Wamsley
|
|
Defendant
John/Jane Does
|
|
Defendant
Sherri Rose-Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
William A Worth II
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 07/03 4:10 PM
ORDER of USCA as to42 Notice of Appeal filed by William A Worth, II dismissing cause for want of prosecution. Note: No Mandate to issue . (sct) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Calendar Entry
Mon 05/07 9:12 AM
Calendar Entry - Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis due by 6/18/2018. (jlk) |
||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/04 3:22 PM
ORDER granting44 Plaintiff's Motion for a 45 day extension of time this Court for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/4/2018. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Att: 1 IFP prisoner form | ||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/03 11:42 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Request for Leave to Proceed on Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (ew) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 04/05 10:00 AM
USCA Case Number 18-3300 for42 Notice of Appeal filed by William A Worth, II. Case Manager - Jill Colyer. (sct) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 04/03 10:45 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re41 Clerk's Judgment (FILING FEE NOT PAID) by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (sem) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 03/14 11:45 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Opinion and Order signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/14/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
40 | 40
10
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Wed 03/14 11:43 AM
ORDER AFFIRMING THE [13 & 25] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; OVERRULING [18 & 32] Plaintiff's objections; DISMISSING AS MOOT22 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike and24 Motion to take Judicial Notice. DENYING11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 3/14/2018. (cw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Reconsideration
Wed 03/07 5:18 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re38 Order on Motion for Leave to File, by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (jlk) |
|
Att: 1 Env. | ||
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 02/05 3:25 PM
ORDER denying37 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Response re Objection to the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/5/18. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/02 4:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to File: Reply to Defendant's Response to25 Objections to Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (jlk) |
|
Att: 1 Env. | ||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 01/12 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Byron D. Turner substituting for Zoe Saadey as to Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Turner, Byron) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/12 1:20 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re33 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Within seven (7) days, counsel is DIRECTED to re-file the Notice in compliance with Local Rule 83.4. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Response (non motion)
Fri 01/12 11:39 AM
Response re32 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Turner, Byron) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Fri 01/12 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Byron D. Turner substituting for Zoe Saadey as to Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Turner, Byron) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 01/03 6:15 PM
OBJECTION to25 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (jlk) |
|
Att: 1 Env. | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 12/06 10:19 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections re25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 12/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/6/2017. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 12/05 5:37 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley (20 day extension requested) by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (jlk) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/09 10:46 AM
ORDER GRANTING28 Motion for Leave to file objections to25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 12/4/2017). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/9/2017. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 11/08 5:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to File an Objection to the Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (jlk) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 11/02 10:35 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts filed by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Saadey, Zoe) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 10/30 9:38 AM
NOTICE by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley Notice of Name Change of Counsel for Defendants (Saadey, Zoe) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 10/20 4:48 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED re14 filed by Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/20/17. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/17 2:01 PM
MOTION Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (jlk) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 07/20 2:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Strike20 Response (non motion),21 Reply (non motion) filed by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Lamberson, Zoe) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Strike
Thu 07/13 12:19 PM
MOTION to Strike Document No.20 Response to Plaintiff's Objection (non motion) and Document No.21 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (non motion) by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (df) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Reply (non motion)
Tue 06/20 4:12 PM
Reply re17 Response in Opposition to Motion,14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss] by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Lamberson, Zoe) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Response (non motion)
Tue 06/20 3:55 PM
Response re18 Objection to Report and Recommendations [Doc 13] by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Lamberson, Zoe) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 06/07 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Zoe A. Lamberson substituting for Thomas E. Madden as to Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Lamberson, Zoe) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 06/06 4:36 PM
OBJECTION to13 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (ew) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/06 4:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (ew) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/26 11:51 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response is due by June 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 26, 2017. (jlk)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/25 2:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (ew) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 04/13 4:09 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (Madden, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/04 4:10 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 4/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/4/2017. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/04 8:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E Madden for Defendants Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley (Madden, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 03/31 9:07 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and/or in the Alternative for a Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (kdp) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/10 8:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed: Sherri Rose-Smith served on 3/1/2017, answer due 3/22/2017. (kdp) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/10 8:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed: Brenda Wamsley served on 3/1/2017, answer due 3/22/2017. (kdp) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 02/27 4:19 PM
[ DOCUMENT REMOVED BY THE CLERK. SEE CORRECTIVE NOTICE FILED 2/27/17 ] ORDER AND INTITIAL SCREEN REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint. Magistrate Judge recommends that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/27/17. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified on 2/27/2017 (ew) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/27 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley. (ew) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 02/27 3:28 PM
ORDER: The Court concludes, at this juncture, that Plaintiff can proceed on his claims under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 that his right to meaningful access to the courts were violated by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/27/17. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
misc
Notice of Corrective Docket Entry
Mon 02/27 4:25 PM
Notice of Correction re 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Document filed in error in this case. Clerk has re-filed the document in the correct case. (ew) |
||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 02/16 2:10 PM
ORDER Granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will conduct an initial screening of the Complaint and then enter an appropriate order and direct service of summons and complaint on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 2/16/2017. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. Copies mailed as Directed.) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 02/14 10:31 AM
Civil cover sheet. (ew) Modified filing date on 2/14/2017 (ew) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/14 10:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff William A Worth, II. (ew) Modified filing date on 2/14/2017 (ew) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Tue 01/17 12:20 PM
ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, the required $400.00 filing fee, or alternatively, an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 1/17/2017. (mas)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against John/Jane Does, Sherri Rose-Smith, Brenda Wamsley filed by William A Worth, II. (kk) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix |