Fields v. Pekin Insurance Company
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
Pekin Insurance Company
2505 Court Street
Pekin, IL 60558 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Fields
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Violet Fields
Terminated: 05/25/2017
13 Janes Street
Jeffersonville, OH 43128 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 12/19 8:57 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/19/17. (jk) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 12/18 12:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Judgment Entry by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company. (Williams, Richard) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Mon 11/06 8:20 AM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Settlement Week due 3/2018. (agm) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/03 5:32 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Primary Expert due by 1/5/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 2/5/2018. Discovery due by 3/1/2018. Responses as to28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment due by 12/6/2017. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/3/2017. (agm) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 11/02 10:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 3/1/2018. by Plaintiff Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/01 4:38 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 11/9/2017 if case should not be set for December 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/1/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/28 8:41 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Response to28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment due by 11/15/2017. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/28/2017. (agm) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/27 3:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment New date requested 11/15/2017. by Plaintiff Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/22 3:07 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company Notice of Filing Deposition Transcripts (Williams, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Fourman Depo Transcript, | ||
Att: 2 Fields Depo Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 34 Transcript | ||
28 | 28
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Fri 09/22 3:00 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company. (Williams, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order
Wed 09/20 1:29 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Primary Expert due by 12/5/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 1/5/2018. Discovery due by 2/1/2018. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/20/2017. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 09/19 10:14 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 2/1/2018. by Plaintiff Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/05 5:20 PM
ORDER STRIKING 23 Notice. The Court DIRECTS Defendant to cease filing notices of service of disclosures until they are used in a proceeding or the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/5/2017. (kdp) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Fri 09/01 1:47 PM
NOTATION ORDER GRANTING22 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff's Primary Expert Disclosure due by 10/5/2017. Defendant's Primary Expert Disclosure due by 11/5/2017. Discovery due by 12/1/2017. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 9/1/17. (mt) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/01 9:42 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company Notice of Pekin's Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Williams, Richard) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 08/28 4:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 12/1/2017. by Plaintiff Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/26 11:33 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company of Deposition of Paul Fields (Williams, Richard) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Thu 07/20 11:51 AM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines pursuant to 7/158/2017 NOTATION ORDER: Primary Expert due by 9/5/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/5/2017. (agm) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 07/18 10:36 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by 11/1/2017. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/18/2017. (agm) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 07/17 4:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 11/1/2017. by Plaintiff Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 07/17 2:02 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint filed by Pekin Insurance Company. (Williams, Richard) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/17 1:59 PM
STIPULATION for Leave to Plead by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company. (Williams, Richard) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Reassigning Case
Sat 07/01 10:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/30/17. (jcw) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Tue 06/27 4:34 PM
ORDER granting14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Primary Expert due by 8/11/2017; Rebuttal Expert due by 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 6/27/2017. (kdp) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 06/27 10:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 8/11/2017. by Plaintiff Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 05/31 1:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pekin Insurance Company, filed by Paul Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Wed 05/31 12:58 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a properly signed amended complaint within three days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/31/17. (sem) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 05/25 12:49 PM
ORDER granting10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Comnplaint and substitute Paul Fields as the named Plaintiff in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/25/2017. (er) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 05/23 4:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and For Substitution of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Violet Fields. (Eshoo, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/25 10:41 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Pekin Insurance Company Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Williams, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Insuring Agreement | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 04/12 12:06 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties due by 6/11/2017. Primary Expert due by 7/11/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/11/2017. Discovery due by 10/11/2017. Dispositive motions due by 11/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/12/17. (sem) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Tue 04/11 4:20 PM
Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/11/2017 before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (jv) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 03/21 8:07 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PARTIES by Plaintiff Violet Fields. (Shadley, Frederic) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/14 12:57 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward Eshoo, Jr. and Karl G. Bach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 3/14/2017. (agm) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/10 9:39 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Edward Eshoo, Jr. and Karl G. Bach by Plaintiff Violet Fields. (Shadley, Frederic) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Eshoo, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Bach | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 03/01 11:18 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference of the parties set for 4/11/2017 @ 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/24 9:07 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Pekin Insurance Company. (Williams, Richard) |
|
Saturday, January 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 01/14 11:07 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Violet Fields re1 Complaint of attached Civil Cover Sheet (Shadley, Frederic) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Pekin Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5799484), filed by Violet Fields. (Shadley, Frederic) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy |