Patchin v. Gulfport Energy Corp. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael H Watson |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00046 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 12, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Gulfport Energy Corp.
50 West Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patriot Drilling Fluids
1300 E. 9th Street
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patterson-UTI Drilling
1300 E. 9th Street
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bert Patchin
429 Paris-Colliers Road
Burgettstown, PA 15021 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 11/15 8:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Bert Patchin. (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 11/14 3:11 PM
ORDER granting40 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 11/15/17. (jk) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 11/07 11:04 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Bert Patchin. (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Stipulation
Mon 11/06 4:44 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Bert Patchin. (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
39 | 39
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 11/06 4:26 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE within one week why the Court should not construe Plaintiff's failure to respond as an abandonment of his claims against these defendants and dismiss the same pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 11/6/17. (jk) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 11/07 8:59 AM
Set Show Cause Response Deadline pursuant to39 . (ew) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/11 2:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Bert Patchin for Plaintiff's Answers to Defendants Gulfport Energy Corporation's and Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
discov
Deposition
Tue 10/10 10:40 AM
DEPOSITION of Bert Patchin taken on 07/24/2017 by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corp., Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Berns, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 10/10 10:16 AM
NOTICE by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corp., Patterson-UTI Drilling of Filing of Deposition Transcript of Bert Patchin. (Berns, Joshua) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 10/10 10:12 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corp., Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Berns, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
trial
Witness List
Tue 08/29 3:09 PM
Witness List by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corp.. (Carlino, Steven) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/14 8:30 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Bert Patchin Disclosure of Expert Witnesses (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/03 8:59 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corp. of IME (Carlino, Steven) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Mon 07/10 12:09 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bert Patchin by Defendants Gulfport Energy Corp., Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Berns, Joshua) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/03 10:15 AM
ORDER adopting23 the Report and Recommendation; denying5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/3/17. (jk) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 06/30 2:02 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corp.. (Carlino, Steven) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/29 11:07 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Bert Patchin of Service of Responses to Def. Q-Max America's Discovery Requests (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 06/28 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Steven G Carlino substituting for Joseph J. Golian as to Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Carlino, Steven) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/28 10:11 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling of Service of Their Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Berns, Joshua) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 06/28 10:06 AM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Joshua C. Berns substituting for Joseph J. Golian as to Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Berns, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/21 2:26 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Patriot Drilling Fluids Notice of Service (Schrader, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 06/14 5:12 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court: It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. 5) be DENIED . Objections to R&R due by 6/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/14/2017. (kdp) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/12 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Berns for Defendants Gulfport Energy Corp., Patterson-UTI Drilling (Berns, Joshua) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/12 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven G Carlino for Defendants Gulfport Energy Corp., Patterson-UTI Drilling (Carlino, Steven) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/15 3:46 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corp. Fed Civ Rule 26 Disclosures (Carlino, Steven) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 05/15 2:25 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling of Service of Patterson-UTI Drilling Company, LLC's Rule 26 Disclosures (Golian, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 05/09 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Matthew Lawrence Schrader substituting for John R. Chlysta & James M. Lyons, Jr. as to Defendant Patriot Drilling Fluids. (Schrader, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 04/26 11:52 AM
ORDER STRIKING16 Notice of Initial Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 . Plaintiff is DIRECTED to cease filing his disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) until they are used in a proceeding or the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/26/2017. (kdp) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/25 10:53 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Bert Patchin of Initial Discovery Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26 (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Mon 04/24 4:10 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December, 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Motions to Amend due by 5/15/2017. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 5/15/2017. Primary Expert due by 6/30/2017. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/30/2017. Discovery due by 12/31/2017. Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/24/2017. (jlk) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Tue 04/25 10:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/20/2017. (sln) |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/04 3:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Patriot Drilling Fluids. (Lyons, James) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/04 3:39 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Patriot Drilling Fluids. (Lyons, James) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 04/04 12:10 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corp.. (Carlino, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/29 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Lyons, Jr for Defendant Patriot Drilling Fluids (Lyons, James) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 03/16 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/15 4:10 PM
STIPULATION for Leave to Plead by Defendant Patriot Drilling Fluids. (Chlysta, John) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/06 4:45 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Gulfport Energy Corp.. (Carlino, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/06 4:24 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Golian, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Brief
Mon 02/13 4:06 PM
BRIEF re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Bert Patchin. (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Mon 02/13 4:04 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Bert Patchin. (Pearl, Kevin) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/20 2:31 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Golian, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Bert Patchin in the Common Pleas Court of Monroe County, Ohio on 11/17/16. (sem) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 01/13 3:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Patterson-UTI Drilling, Patterson-UT Drilling Company, Inc, Patterson-UTI Energy, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Patterson-UT Drilling Company, Inc, Other Affiliate Patterson-UTI Energy, Inc for Patterson-UTI Drilling.. (Golian, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 01/13 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2016-350 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5799621), filed by Patterson-UTI Drilling. (Golian, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E |