Bremke v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sharon L Ovington |
Referred: | Sharon L Ovington |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00011 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Interested Party
SSA
|
|
Plaintiff
Amy C. Bremke
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 03/28 4:12 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 3/28/18. (kma) |
|
11 | 11
25
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/28 4:07 PM
DECISION AND ENTRY - Accordingly, reversal of the ALJs decision and remand for an award of benefits are warranted. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT:1. The Commissioners non-disability finding is reversed; 2. The case is remanded to the Social Security Administration under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for payment of benefits based on Plaintiffs application for Disability Insurance Benefits filed on July 22, 2013 and her application for Supplemental Security Income protectively filed on July 22, 2013; and 3. The case is terminated on the docket of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 3/28/18. (kma) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 10/16 7:39 AM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/16/2017. (jmb) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Opposition to Statement of Specific Errors
Wed 09/20 8:07 PM
Response in Opposition re7 Statement of Specific Errors by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Reply to Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 10/5/2017. (Ochoa, Susana) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Tue 08/22 8:59 AM
NOTATION ORDER: Granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 9/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 8/22/2017. (lek) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/21 7:42 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Statement of Specific Errors New date requested 9/20/2017. by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Ochoa, Susana) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Specific Errors
Wed 07/05 1:29 PM
STATEMENT OF SPECIFIC ERRORS by Plaintiff Amy C. Bremke Opposition to Statement of Errors due by 8/21/2017. (Raper, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Tue 06/06 9:09 AM
NOTATION ORDER: Granting6 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Errors filed by Plaintiff Amy C. Bremke. Statement of Errors due by 7/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 6/6/2017. (lek) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 06/05 8:34 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 7/5/2017. by Plaintiff Amy C. Bremke. (Raper, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 05/04 9:42 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response/Reply due by June 5, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 5-4-17. (mcm) |
||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 05/03 3:08 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 6/4/2017. by Plaintiff Amy C. Bremke. (Raper, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certified Administrative Record - SSA Cases Only
Mon 03/20 10:08 AM
First CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Defendant Statement of Errors due by 5/4/2017. (Stark, John) |
|
Att: 1 court transcript index, | ||
Att: 2 documents related to administrative process, | ||
Att: 3 payment documents and decisions, | ||
Att: 4 jurisdictional documents and notices, | ||
Att: 5 nondisability related development, | ||
Att: 6 disability related development, | ||
Att: 7 medical records part 1, | ||
Att: 8 medical records part 2, | ||
Att: 9 medical records part 3, | ||
Att: 10 medical records part 4, | ||
Att: 11 medical records part 5 | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/14 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susana Ochoa for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Ochoa, Susana) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 01/13 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security c/o Office of General Counsel, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/13 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5799135), filed by Amy C. Bremke. (Raper, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Form, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Form |