ATLANTIS SEAFOOD, LLC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Sandra R Klein |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10452 |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2020 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Debtor
ATLANTIS SEAFOOD, LLC
10501 Valley Blvd Ste 1820
El Monte, CA 91731-3623 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Howard M Ehrenberg (TR)
SulmeyerKupetz 333 South Hope Street, 35th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
Trustee
Jason M Rund (TR)
Sheridan & Rund 840 Apollo Street, Suite 351
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 08/23/2017 3:17 PM PDT |
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 01/13 5:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:17-bk-10452) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44042345. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Fri 01/13 5:13 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Lo, Michael) |
||
1 | 1
39
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 01/13 4:55 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by ATLANTIS SEAFOOD, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/27/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/27/2017. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/27/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/27/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/27/2017. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/27/2017. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/27/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/27/2017. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 01/27/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/27/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/27/2017. (Lo, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Fri 01/13 5:02 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor ATLANTIS SEAFOOD, LLC. (Lo, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corp Resolution Auth Filing
Fri 01/13 5:10 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor ATLANTIS SEAFOOD, LLC. (Lo, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 01/13 5:12 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Debtor ATLANTIS SEAFOOD, LLC. (Lo, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Fri 01/13 5:13 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/16/2017 at 10:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Lo, Michael) |