Butsch v. Monsanto Company
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00167 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 11, 2017 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig R Butsch
3474 SAIGON DR
WESTERVILLE, OH 43081 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/29 2:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/29/2017) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 12/29 2:20 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/29/2017) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Fri 12/29 2:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 12/29/2017) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Transcript
Fri 03/10 3:35 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/27/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 3/10/2017) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Transcript
Tue 03/07 2:22 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/24/2017, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/7/2017) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/13 9:54 AM
Case transferred in from District of Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:16-cv-01112. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 1/13/2017 (farS, COURT STAFF). |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6): Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on MDL, this action is transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel on 1/6/2017; certified by the Clerk of Court for Northern California on 1/6/2017. (er) | |
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-6) - 3 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in FLM/2:16-cv-00860, 1 in FLN/4:16-cv-00758, 80 in MDL No. 2741, 1 in OHS/2:16-cv-01112) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/6/2017.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, FLM/2:16-cv-00860, FLN/4:16-cv-00758, OHS/2:16-cv-01112 (LAH) (pb) | ||
Case transferred to District of Northern California. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) | ||
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Maja Lukic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/28/16. (sem) | |
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 06485775946) of Maja Lukic by Plaintiff Craig R Butsch. (Mordarski, Daniel) | |
Att: 1 Maja Lukic Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Monsanto Company answer due 1/20/2017. (agm) | ||
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Monsanto Company on 12/5/2016, answer due 2/3/2017. (Mordarski, Daniel) | |
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Craig R Butsch of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Mordarski, Daniel) | |
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5738186), filed by CRAIG R BUTSCH. (Mordarski, Daniel) |